EP3804246 - SKEW DETECTION AND CORRECTION FOR ORTHOGONAL DIFFERENTIAL VECTOR SIGNALING CODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kandou Labs, S.A. Rue des Jordils 1B 1025 Saint-Sulpice / CH | [2023/30] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Kandou Labs, S.A. EPFL Innovation Park Building I 1015 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORMATI, Ali c/o Kandou Labs, S.A. EPFL Innovation Park Building I 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Jones, Sam, et al Polaris IP Limited The Bristol Office, 2nd Floor 5 High Street Westbury On Trym, Bristol BS9 3BY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/33] | Jones, Sam, et al Kandou Bus Ltd 200 Brook Drive, Green Park Reading RG2 6UB / GB | ||
Former [2021/15] | AWA Sweden AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 19734970.7 | 07.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US36169 | Priority number, date | US201862683440P | 11.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862683440 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019241080 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804246 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3804246 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04L7/00, H04L25/49, H03M7/20, H04B3/02, H04L1/00, H04L25/08, H04L25/14 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H04L25/0292 (EP,KR);
H04L25/0272 (KR);
H04L7/02 (KR,US);
H03M5/14 (EP);
H04L25/0274 (EP);
H04L25/49 (EP);
H04L7/0087 (KR,US);
H03M7/20 (EP);
H04B3/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSATZERKENNUNG UND -KORREKTUR FÜR ORTHOGONALE DIFFERENTIELLE VEKTORSIGNALISIERUNGSCODES | [2021/15] | English: | SKEW DETECTION AND CORRECTION FOR ORTHOGONAL DIFFERENTIAL VECTOR SIGNALING CODES | [2021/15] | French: | DÉTECTION ET CORRECTION D'OBLIQUITÉ POUR CODES DE SIGNALISATION DE VECTEURS DIFFÉRENTIELS ORTHOGONAUX | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013091392 (VALLIAPPAN MAGESH [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0057]; figure 9 *; | [A]US2016380787 (HORMATI ALI [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047]; figure 11 * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] *; | [A]US9577815 (SIMPSON RICHARD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6 - column 7; figures 2,7 * | by applicant | US9100232 | US9288089 | US20100784414 |