EP3738059 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING AND MITIGATING CODE INJECTION ATTACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digital Immunity LLC 60 Mall Road, Suite 309 Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUBLIN, Henry, R. c/o Digital Immunity LLC 60 Mail Road, Suite 309 Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19735911.0 | 08.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019US12662 | Priority number, date | US201862614616P | 08.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862614616 P | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019136428 | Date: | 11.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738059 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/12, G06F21/44, G06F21/51, G06F21/55, G06F21/52, G06F21/56 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
G06F21/566 (EP,IL,US);
G06F21/52 (EP,IL,US);
G06F18/295 (IL,US);
G06F21/554 (IL,US);
G06F21/562 (IL,US);
G06F2221/033 (IL,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | G06F21/12, G06F21/44, G06F21/51, G06F21/55 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION UND ABSCHWÄCHUNG VON CODEINJEKTIONSANGRIFFEN | [2020/47] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING AND MITIGATING CODE INJECTION ATTACKS | [2020/47] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION ET D'ATTÉNUATION D'ATTAQUES PAR INJECTION DE CODE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012023583 (SALLAM AHMED SAID [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y] - Paruj Ratanaworabhan ET AL, "NOZZLE: A Defense Against Heap-spraying Code Injection Attacks", Proceedings of the USENIX Security Symposium, August 2009, (20090831), pages 1 - 18, URL: https://kapravelos.com/papers/nozzle.pdf, (20160705), XP055286057 [Y] 1-15 * last paragraph; column 2 * * section 4.1; column 13 * * section 4.3; column 15 * | International search | [Y]US2009144827 (PEINADO MARCUS [US], et al) [Y] 7, 14, 20* ; paragraph [0087]; claim 18 *; | [XY]US2012023583 (SALLAM AHMED SAID [US]) [X] 1, 5, 8, 12, 15, 19 * ; paragraphs [0005], [0027], [0034], [0077] claim 14 * [Y] 2-4, 6, 7, 9-11, 13, 14, 16-18, 20; | [Y]US8176559 (MATHUR RACHIT [US], et al) [Y] 2, 9, 16 * ; abstract; *; | [Y]US9202049 (BOOK NEIL [US], et al) [Y] 6, 13 * ; column 10, lines 36-46; column 13, lines 60-64; column 21, line 66 to column 22, line 14; claim 16 *; | [Y]US2016328563 (KAUFMAN PHILIP D [US]) [Y] 3, 4, 10, 11, 17, 18 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0028], [0031] * | by applicant | US2012023583 | - PARUJ RATANAWORABHAN et al., "NOZZLE: A Defense Against Heap-spraying Code Injection Attacks", Proceedings of the USENIX Security Symposium, (20090831), pages 1 - 18, XP055286057 |