EP3753403 - FISHING SWIVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globeride, Inc. 14-16 Maesawa 3-chome Higashikurume-shi, Tokyo 203-8511 / JP | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKISHIMA, Yukio c/o Globeride, Inc. 14-16, Maesawa 3-chome Higashikurume-shi, Tokyo 203-8511 / JP | 02 /
UETA, Kouhei 476-1, Imaichi, Shikano-cho Tottori-shi, Tottori 689-0425 / JP | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 19735958.1 | 07.01.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019JP00103 | Priority number, date | JP20180000867 | 05.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018000867 | [2020/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019135413 | Date: | 11.07.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753403 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01K91/03, A01K91/047 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
A01K91/03 (EP,US);
A01K91/047 (EP,KR);
A01K91/14 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | A01K91/047 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | ANGELWIRBEL | [2020/52] | English: | FISHING SWIVEL | [2020/52] | French: | ÉMERILLON DE PÊCHE | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2020 | Translation filed | 16.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH0690645 (ONO KINZOKU KOGYOSHO KK); | [Y]US5381650 (GARRETT CHARLES R [US]); | [YD]JPH1188 (MARUKIN KK); | [A]US2007031183 (SIM WOO-KYUNG [KR]) | International search | [Y]JPS51122095U (YARIE, Fudeo) [Y] 1-12 * , specification, page 1, line 8 to page 2, line 3, fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS5992671U (ONO, Takashi) [Y] 7-11 * , specification, page 3, line 6 to page 4, line 5, fig. 1-4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS61234727 (ONO TAKASHI) [Y] 7-11 * , page 2, upper right column, lines 6-19, lower left column, line 18 to lower right column, line 9, fig. 4-5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH06113699 (FURUTA YOSHIKAZU) [A] 1-12 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09172921 (TSURIKEN KK [JP]) [A] 1-12* , entire text, all drawings & KR 10-0402970 B *; | [Y]JPH1188 (MARUKIN KK) [Y] 12 * , paragraphs [0012]-[0016], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2000345384 (RICOH KK) [Y] 7-11 * , paragraph [0002] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015092009 (SHIMANO KK) [Y] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0022], [0033], [0040]-[0041], [0058]-[0065], fig. 5, 16-20 & US 2015/0093593 A1, paragraphs [0032], [0066], [0072]-[0073], [0090]-[0097], fig. 5, 16-20 & CN 104512513 A & KR 10-2015-0039548 A *; | [A]JP2017153473 (FUJIC FISHING TACKLE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH09172921 | JPH1188 |