EP3671888 - SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING ELECTRODE TAB PROVIDED WITH INSULATION COATING LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Joo-Sung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KO, Myung-Soo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHUNG, Joo-Young LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Shin-Hyo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
JIN, Sun-Mi LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/16] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2020/26] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19736235.3 | 04.01.2019 | [2020/26] | WO2019KR00171 | Priority number, date | KR20180001303 | 04.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180001303 | [2020/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019135640 | Date: | 11.07.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3671888 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3671888 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/528, H01M10/052, H01M10/0569, H01M10/42 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP,KR);
H01M50/172 (KR);
H01M4/623 (US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,KR);
H01M10/4235 (EP,KR);
H01M4/131 (US);
H01M4/1391 (US);
H01M50/178 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/183 (KR);
H01M50/528 (EP,KR);
H01M50/531 (KR);
H01M50/536 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/543 (KR);
H01M2220/30 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | H01M10/052, H01M2/22, H01M10/0569, H01M10/42 | ||
Former IPC [2020/26] | H01M2/06, H01M2/08, H01M2/26, H01M2/02, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT EINER ELEKTRODENLASCHE MIT EINER ISOLIERSCHICHT | [2020/26] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING ELECTRODE TAB PROVIDED WITH INSULATION COATING LAYER | [2020/26] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE COMPRENANT UNE LANGUETTE D'ÉLECTRODE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT ISOLANT | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2020 | Translation filed | 20.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 27.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2437330 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* claim 1 *; | [A]EP2802029 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP3073552 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2007122715 (FUJINO AKIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * See the entire document. *; | [Y]KR20070062458 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0053], [0056], [0076], [0077], [0101], [0112]; and claims 1, 8. *; | [A]WO2014091857 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * See the entire document. *; | [A]WO2015015894 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-15* See the entire document. *; | [Y]US2016372743 (CHO MYUNG [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0007], [0019] , [0032], [0069], [0077], [0088], [0105]; claims 19, 25; and figure 3. * | by applicant | KR20180001303 |