EP3810247 - MEDICAL DEVICE COMPRISING A SMART HANDLE FOR IMPROVING HANDLING OF AN ELONGATED FUNCTIONAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basecamp Vascular 27 rue Linné 75005 Paris / FR | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAZENEUVE, Jean-Baptiste 3 allée Edouard Quincey 94200 Ivry-sur-Seine / FR | 02 /
MAIANO, Camille 1 Lesven 29810 Brélès / FR | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19736312.0 | 20.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019EP66372 | Priority number, date | EP20180305778 | 20.06.2018 Original published format: EP 18305778 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019243515 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810247 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01, A61M25/09, H01R39/10, A61B17/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61M25/09041 (EP);
A61M25/09 (US);
A61B1/01 (EP);
A61B17/00234 (EP);
A61M25/0136 (EP,US);
A61M25/0158 (EP,US);
A61B1/0052 (US);
A61B2017/00318 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP);
A61B2017/00411 (EP);
A61B2017/0046 (EP);
A61B2017/00778 (EP);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/291 (EP);
A61B2034/303 (EP);
A61M2025/09116 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09133 (EP);
A61M2025/09175 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM INTELLIGENTEN GRIFF ZUR VERBESSERTEN HANDHABUNG EINES LÄNGLICHEN FUNKTIONSSYSTEMS | [2021/17] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE COMPRISING A SMART HANDLE FOR IMPROVING HANDLING OF AN ELONGATED FUNCTIONAL SYSTEM | [2021/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL COMPRENANT UNE POIGNÉE INTELLIGENTE POUR AMÉLIORER LA MANIPULATION D'UN SYSTÈME FONCTIONNEL ALLONGÉ | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 20.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5025799 (WILSON BRUCE C [US]); | [A]US5137288 (STARKEY JOHN J [US], et al); | [Y]US5178159 (CHRISTIAN JEFFREY J [US]); | [A]EP0543539 (INTELLIWIRE INC [US]); | [Y]US5357979 (IMRAN MIR A [US]); | [A]US5403297 (IMRAN MIR A [US]); | [A]US2003199818 (WALDHAUSER STEVEN L [US], et al); | [YA]US2005277988 (WHITTAKER DAVID R [US], et al); | [A]US2012197190 (SUON NAROUN [US], et al); | [YA]EP3326549 (ETHICON LLC [PR]) |