EP3903456 - SERVICE INSERTION IN PUBLIC CLOUD ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VMware LLC 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states VMWare, Inc. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRA, Mukesh 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
JAIN, Rahul 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2024/34] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
HIRA, Mukesh Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
02 /
JAIN, Rahul Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2024/34] |
Former [2021/44] | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19737318.6 | 12.06.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019US36812 | Priority number, date | US201916251083 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US201916251083 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020149875 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903456 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3903456 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/745, H04L45/302 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04L45/306 (EP);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
G06F9/45558 (US);
H04L12/4633 (US);
H04L12/4641 (US);
H04L45/04 (US);
H04L49/354 (US);
H04L49/70 (US);
H04L69/22 (US);
H04L2212/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | H04L12/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIENSTEINFÜGUNG IN ÖFFENTLICHEN CLOUD-UMGEBUNGEN | [2021/44] | English: | SERVICE INSERTION IN PUBLIC CLOUD ENVIRONMENTS | [2021/44] | French: | INSERTION DE SERVICE DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS EN NUAGE PUBLIC | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 26.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2014050223 (FOO IAN [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0024] , [0032] * * claims 1-6 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2016352538 (CHIU JECHUN [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0019] , [0038] ** figures 2b,2c *; | [A]US9531850 (NAINAR NAGENDRA KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 25 - line 33 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 28 * * claim 1 * |