EP3818406 - PROGRAMMABLE MULTIPLE-POINT ILLUMINATOR, CONFOCAL FILTER, CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE AND METHOD TO OPERATE SAID CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitat de Barcelona Centre de Patents de la UB Baldiri Reixac 4 - Torre D 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTES USATEGUI, Mario Universitat de Barcelona Dept. Física Aplicada Facultat de Física Martí i Franquès, 1 08028 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
BOLA SAMPOL, Raúl Universitat de Barcelona Dept. Física Aplicada Facultat de Física Martí i Franquès, 1 08028 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
MARTÍN BADOSA, Estela Universitat de Barcelona Dept. Física Aplicada Facultat de Física Martí i Franquès, 1 08028 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
TREPTOW, Dorian Universitat de Barcelona Dept. Física Aplicada Facultat de Física Martí i Franquès, 1 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 19737490.3 | 01.07.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019EP67517 | Priority number, date | EP20180382491 | 02.07.2018 Original published format: EP 18382491 | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020007761 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3818406 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02F1/11, G02B26/10 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
G02B21/0036 (EP,CN,US);
G02B13/0095 (CN,US);
G02B21/0032 (EP,CN,US);
G02B21/0076 (CN,US);
G02B26/101 (EP,CN);
G02F1/33 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | PROGRAMMIERBARER MEHRPUNKTBELEUCHTER, KONFOKALER FILTER, KONFOKALES MIKROSKOP UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DES KONFOKALEN MIKROSKOPS | [2021/19] | English: | PROGRAMMABLE MULTIPLE-POINT ILLUMINATOR, CONFOCAL FILTER, CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE AND METHOD TO OPERATE SAID CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE | [2021/19] | French: | ILLUMINATEUR À POINTS MULTIPLES PROGRAMMABLE, FILTRE CONFOCAL, MICROSCOPE CONFOCAL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER LEDIT MICROSCOPE CONFOCAL | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 02.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4827125 (GOLDSTEIN SETH R [US]) [Y] 1,9,10 * columns 7-12; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-8,11-15; | [Y]US2017115547 (HARTELL NICHOLAS ANTHONY [GB]) [Y] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]US2017242232 (LEGER JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0054] - [0113] * | by applicant | US9395340 | - W. LIU et al., "Nonnegative Singular Value Decomposition for Microarray Data Analysis of Spermatogenesis", Proceedings of the 5th International Conference on Information Technology and Application in Biomedicine, (20080000), pages 225 - 228, XP031289320 |