EP3818197 - ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKPO Fuel Cell Technologies GmbH Max-Eyth-Strasse 2 72581 Dettingen / DE | [2022/42] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Strasse 2 72581 Dettingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAHL, Peter Reutlinger Strasse 3 72555 Metzingen / DE | 02 /
KRAFT, Jürgen Öschweg 2/2 72555 Metzingen / DE | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19737677.5 | 28.06.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019EP67370 | Priority number, date | DE201810115983 | 02.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018115983 | [2021/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020007735 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3818197 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25B9/20, H01M8/0271, H01M8/0286, H01M8/242, H01M8/2483, H01M8/1018 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
H01M8/2483 (EP,US);
C25B13/02 (US);
C25B9/77 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (US);
H01M8/0271 (EP);
H01M8/0276 (US);
H01M8/0286 (EP,US);
H01M8/242 (EP);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 18.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102014104017 (ELRINGKLINGER AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1, 9, 15 * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0050] - [0067] - [0077] - [0127] *; | [X]DE102007003096 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-11 * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0014] - [0019] - [0021] *; | [X]DE102006054849 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1, 14, 15, 21-28 * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0049] - [0055] - [0064] *; | [X]US2006127735 (SABIN PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1, 3, 7, 8, 12-15, 40 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0036] - [0055] - [0059] * |