EP3826577 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DENTAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dekema Dental-Keramiköfen GmbH Industriestrasse 22 83395 Freilassing / DE | [2023/34] |
Former [2021/22] | For all designated states Redios-Tec GmbH Industriestr. 22 83395 Freilassing / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Stephan Adalbert-Stifter-Str. 19 83278 Traunstein / DE | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19737728.6 | 09.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019EP68314 | Priority number, date | DE201810119079 | 06.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018119079 | [2021/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020030359 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826577 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3826577 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, A61C13/08, A61C13/34 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C13/20 (EP,US);
A61C13/00 (EP);
A61C13/0013 (EP);
A61C13/08 (EP);
A61C13/081 (EP);
A61C13/34 (EP,US);
A61C5/77 (EP);
A61C9/0053 (US);
B29C33/3835 (US);
B29C33/3842 (US);
B29C33/3892 (US);
B29C33/448 (US);
B29C64/393 (US);
B33Y50/02 (US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
F27B17/025 (US);
A61C13/083 (EP);
B29L2031/753 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DENTALBAUTEILS | [2021/22] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DENTAL COMPONENT | [2021/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DENTAIRE | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2007060142 (HERBST BREMER GOLDSCHLAEGEREI [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,18,21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 46] , [0 84] , [0 90] , [0 95] , [ 101] - [0103] - [ 114] * [Y] 3 [I] 7,17,25; | [Y]DE102006056451 (KETTENBACH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 3* paragraphs [0001] , [00 8] , [0 10] *; | [X]WO2018038954 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,18 * page 2, lines 21-27 * * page 4, lines 3-12 * * page 5, lines 6-11 *; | [X]US2018171052 (BONDERER LORENZ JOSEF [CH]) [X] 1,18 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 99] , [ 100] * |