EP3720196 - TIMER PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/34] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUANG, Yiru Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XU, Haibo Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CAO, Zhenzhen Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LI, Bingzhao Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/34] |
Former [2020/41] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 19738162.7 | 11.01.2019 | [2020/41] | WO2019CN71294 | Priority number, date | CN20181028302 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810028302 | [2020/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137457 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720196 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3720196 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,KR,RU);
H04L5/0098 (EP,KR,RU);
H04W52/0229 (CN,KR,RU);
H04W52/0216 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04W52/02 (RU);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04W72/12 (RU);
H04W72/23 (CN,KR,RU);
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TIMER-VERARBEITUNG UND ENDGERÄTVORRICHTUNG | [2020/41] | English: | TIMER PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2020/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE TEMPORISATEUR, ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2020 | Translation filed | 03.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP22185075.3 / EP4185051 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2022 | AT | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | DK | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | PL | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | LU | 11.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/47] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
LU | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3478019 (COMCAST CABLE COMM LLC [US]) [E] 1,2,4-9,11-13 * paragraphs [0130] , [0240] , [0259] , [0306] , [0296] , [0297] , [0307] * * figure 20 *; | [E]WO2019088531 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0076] - [0120] *; | [E]EP3512286 (HTC CORP [TW]) [E] 1,3,10,12,13 * paragraph [0021] *; | [E]EP3570613 (COMCAST CABLE COMM LLC [US]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0167] - [0176] *; | [E]EP3720167 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0040] - [0050] - [0064] - [0065] - [0072] - [0078] *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180104), vol. RAN WG2, no. V15.0.0, pages 1 - 55, XP051392362 [A] 1-13 * Section 5.15 * | [XP] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on BWP inactivity timer", vol. RAN WG2, no. Vancouver, Canada; 20180122 - 20180126, (20180112), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1800189 DISCUSSION ON BWP INACTIVITY TIMER, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5FAHs/2018%5F01%5FNR/Docs/, (20180112), XP051386067 [XP] 1-13 * Section 2.1 * | International search | [A]CN101946424 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-81; | [A]CN102300331 [A] 1-81; | [X] - HUAWEI, HISILICON, "Overview of bandwidth part, CA , and DC operation in- cluding SRS switching", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting NR#3 Rl-1715425, (20170921), XP051329026 [X] 1-81 * ), * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "The Impact of Bandwidth Part on RAN2: Overview and Issues", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #99bis R2-1711595, (20171013), XP051304064 [A] 1-81 * , * | [A] - "SPS operations for BWP switching", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #99-Bis R2-1710134, (20171013), XP051342201 [A] 1-81 * , * |