EP3734873 - CHANNEL ENCODING METHOD AND ENCODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xianbin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Huazi Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Rong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Jun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
DU, Yinggang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 19738449.8 | 14.01.2019 | [2020/45] | WO2019CN71662 | Priority number, date | CN20181031522 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810031522 | [2020/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137537 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734873 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3734873 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H03M13/11, H03M13/29, H03M13/13 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H04L1/0041 (EP);
H03M13/13 (EP,CN,US);
H03M13/2903 (EP);
H04L1/0013 (CN);
H04L1/0057 (EP,CN,US);
H03M13/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANALCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND CODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/45] | English: | CHANNEL ENCODING METHOD AND ENCODING DEVICE | [2020/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE DE CANAL ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2020 | Translation filed | 27.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 19.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016013887 (SHEN HUI [CN], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10,11,15 * page 5, column l, paragraph 120 - page 6, column r, paragraph 165; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-4,7-9,12-14; | [A] - NIU KAI ET AL, "Polar codes: Primary concepts and practical decoding algorithms", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, vol. 52, no. 7, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2014.6852102, ISSN 0163-6804, (20140701), pages 192 - 203, (20140710), XP011553413 [A] 1-15 * Section "Encoding and Construction", pages 194-196, and sections "Successive Cancellation Decoding" and "Simplified SC decoding", pages 197-199;; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2014.6852102 | International search | [A]US2017244429 (HOF ERAN [IL], et al)[A] 1-27; | [A]CN107113009 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-27; | [A]CN107204779 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27; | [A]CN107342846 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 | by applicant | CN20181031522 |