EP3719562 - DIFFRACTION LIGHT GUIDE PLATE AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jeong Ho LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Seong Min LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Sang Choll LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Bu Gon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 19738519.8 | 14.01.2019 | [2020/41] | WO2019KR00548 | Priority number, date | KR20180004481 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180004481 | KR20180004482 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180004482 | KR20180004483 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180004483 | [2020/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019139440 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719562 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/42, F21V8/00, G02B27/01 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B6/0016 (US);
G02B27/0081 (EP);
G02B27/4205 (US);
G02B2027/0105 (EP);
G02B2027/012 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | STREULICHTFÜHRUNGSPLATTE UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/41] | English: | DIFFRACTION LIGHT GUIDE PLATE AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2020/41] | French: | PLAQUE DE GUIDAGE DE LUMIÈRE DE DIFFRACTION ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE LA COMPRENANT | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2020 | Translation filed | 02.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1068548 (ELOP ELECTROOPTICS IND LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0025]; figure 6 *; | [XY]US2010214659 (LEVOLA TAPANI [FI]) [X] 1-5,7-12 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [A]US8508848 (SAARIKKO PASI [FI]) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [A]JP2007219106 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC)[A] 1-12; | [A]JP2008523435 (NOKIA CORP.) [A] 1-12; | [Y]US2010214659 (LEVOLA TAPANI [FI]) [Y] 1-6, 12; | [A]KR20150122341 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12; | [YA]KR20160101104 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-6, 12 [A] 7-11 |