EP3737219 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR AGRICULTURAL MATERIAL APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precision Planting LLC 23207 Townline Road Tremont, IL 61568 / US | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HODEL, Jeremy 303 Lotus Dr. Morton, Illinois 61550 / US | 02 /
URBANIAK, Douglas William 405 West 2nd Street Mackinaw, Illinois 61755 / US | 03 /
SOLBERG, Jordan Charles 201 Brookview Rd East Peoria, Illinois 61611 / US | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | AGCO Intellectual Property Department AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | AGCO Intellectual Property Department AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth, Warwickshire CV8 2TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19739083.4 | 04.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019US12363 | Priority number, date | US201862615217P | 09.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862615217 P | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019139834 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737219 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01C5/06, A01C7/06, A01C7/20 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
A01C5/062 (EP);
A01C5/064 (EP,US);
A01C5/06 (EP);
A01C5/068 (US);
A01C7/201 (EP);
A01C7/203 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | A01C5/06, A01C5/08, A01C7/06, A01C15/00, A01C23/02, A01B35/24, A01B61/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEM MATERIAL | [2020/47] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR AGRICULTURAL MATERIAL APPLICATION | [2020/47] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR APPLICATION DE MATIÈRE AGRICOLE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 15.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012167809 (BASSETT JOSEPH D [US]); | [A]US2014076215 (PETER JEFFREY J [US]); | [A]WO2017124143 (BLAST R & D PTY LTD [AU]); | [XP]WO2018053274 (PREC PLANTING LLC [US]); | [XP]EP3400773 (DEERE & CO [US]) | International search | [A]US2003042336 (WUTTKE GILBERT [DE], et al); | [Y]US2004149187 (BUCHHOLTZ PAUL H [US]); | [A]US6986313 (HALFORD JAMES WILLIAM [CA], et al); | [Y]US2012014764 (DAVIDSON GLEN W [US], et al); | [XY]US2012167809 (BASSETT JOSEPH D [US]); | [A]US2014109809 (SCHILLING ROBIN B [CA], et al); | [A]US2015319915 (PFITZNER JASON JAMES MICHAEL [AU]); | [A]US9820427 (HAGNY MATTHEW P [US]) | by applicant | US5970891 | US2012137809 | WO2018053274 | EP3400773 | WO2016US37701 |