EP3791585 - PARTIAL/FULL PRUNING WHEN ADDING A HMVP CANDIDATE TO MERGE/AMVP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Bytedance Network Technology Co., Ltd. Room B-0035 2/F Building 3 No.30 Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | For all designated states ByteDance Inc. 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Beijing Bytedance Network Technology Co. Ltd. Room B-0035 2/F Building 3 No.30 Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | ||
For all designated states ByteDance Inc. 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Li c/o ByteDance Inc. 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Kai c/o ByteDance Inc. 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | 03 /
LIU, Hongbin Jinritoutiao Post Office China Satellite Communications Tower No. 63, Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Yue Jinritoutiao Post Office China Satellite Communications Tower No. 63, Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19739405.9 | 01.07.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019IB55582 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN93663 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/093663 | WO2018CN105193 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/105193 | WO2018CN117627 | 27.11.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/117627 | WO2019CN71214 | 10.01.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/071214 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020003275 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791585 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/70 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,KR);
H04N19/176 (CN,KR,US);
H04N19/513 (CN,US);
H04N19/105 (KR);
H04N19/61 (CN,KR);
H04N19/70 (EP,KR);
H04N19/96 (EP,CN,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | TEIL-/VOLL-PRUNING BEIM HINZUFÜGEN EINES HMVP-KANDIDATEN ZU FUSION/AMVP | [2021/11] | English: | PARTIAL/FULL PRUNING WHEN ADDING A HMVP CANDIDATE TO MERGE/AMVP | [2021/11] | French: | ÉLAGAGE PARTIEL/COMPLET LORS DE L'AJOUT D'UN CANDIDAT HMVP À LA FUSION/AMVP | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 08.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2532160 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]EP2668784 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [X]US2013336406 (ZHANG LI [US], et al); | [X]WO2017197126 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); |