EP3740210 - THERAPEUTIC TARGETING OF RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR-INDUCED ANDROGEN RECEPTOR PHOSPHORYLATION IN CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 518 Indiana Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILI, Roberto c/o Indiana University and Research Technology Corporation 518 Indiana Ave. Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 19740741.4 | 18.01.2019 | [2020/48] | WO2019US14153 | Priority number, date | US201862619210P | 19.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862619210 P | US201862647282P | 23.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862647282 P | US201862679477P | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679477 P | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143908 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740210 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/404, A61K31/4166, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
G01N33/57419 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/404, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4166, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/48] | A61K31/567, A61K31/4166, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHES TARGETING VON DURCH REZEPTOR-TYROSINKINASE-INHIBITOR INDUZIERTER ANDROGENREZEPTORPHOSPHORYLIERUNG BEI KREBS | [2020/48] | English: | THERAPEUTIC TARGETING OF RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR-INDUCED ANDROGEN RECEPTOR PHOSPHORYLATION IN CANCER | [2020/48] | French: | CIBLAGE THÉRAPEUTIQUE D'UNE PHOSPHORYLATION DES RÉCEPTEURS AUX ANDROGÈNES INDUITE PAR UN INHIBITEUR DES RÉCEPTEURS À ACTIVITÉ TYROSINE KINASE DANS LE CANCER | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 04.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007004753 (SAWYERS CHARLES L [US], et al) [A] 1-6,9,10,14,15 * claim - *; | [X]WO2010044893 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,14,15 * claims 1-4,9 *; | [X]WO2014165779 (EXELIXIS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,10,14,15 * paragraph [0002] *; | [X] - ADELAIYE-OGALA REMI M. ET AL, "Abstract 4170: Targeting androgen receptor overcomes resistance to tyrosine kinase inhibitors in advanced clear cell renal cell carcinoma", CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 77, no. 13 Supplement, doi:10.1158/1538-7445.AM2017-4170, (20170701), URL: https://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/77/13_Supplement/4170, XP055842527 [X] 1-4,9,10,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2017-4170 | [X] - ARMSTRONG ANDREW J ET AL, "Phase II trial of the PI3 kinase inhibitor buparlisib (BKM-120) with or without enzalutamide in men with metastatic castration resistant prostate cancer", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM NL, (20170511), vol. 81, doi:10.1016/J.EJCA.2017.02.030, ISSN 0959-8049, pages 228 - 236, XP085115689 [X] 1-3,6,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejca.2017.02.030 | [X] - MICHAEL A. GORDON ET AL, "Synergy between Androgen Receptor Antagonism and Inhibition of mTOR and HER2 in Breast Cancer", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, US, (20170503), vol. 16, no. 7, doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-17-0111, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 1389 - 1400, XP055558198 [X] 1-3,5,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-17-0111 | [X] - EMMA K BEARDSLEY ET AL, "A phase II study of sorafenib in combination with bicalutamide in patients with chemotherapy-naive castration resistant prostate cancer", INVESTIGATIONAL NEW DRUGS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20110723), vol. 30, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S10637-011-9722-5, ISSN 1573-0646, pages 1652 - 1659, XP035079550 [X] 1-4,9,10,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10637-011-9722-5 | [A] - SÁNCHEZ-GASTALDO AMPARO ET AL, "Systemic treatment of renal cell cancer: A comprehensive review", CANCER TREATMENT REVIEWS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20171101), vol. 60, doi:10.1016/j.ctrv.2017.08.010, ISSN 0305-7372, pages 77 - 89, XP055843836 [A] 1-6,9,10,14,15 * page 79 - page 83 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ctrv.2017.08.010 | [A] - QUINTELA MARTÍN LÁZARO ET AL, "Enzalutamide: A new prostate cancer targeted therapy against the androgen receptor", CANCER TREATMENT REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150108), vol. 41, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.CTRV.2014.12.006, ISSN 0305-7372, pages 247 - 253, XP029199333 [A] 1-6,9,10,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ctrv.2014.12.006 | [XP] - ADELAIYE-OGALA REMI ET AL, "Therapeutic Targeting of Sunitinib-Induced AR Phosphorylation in Renal Cell Carcinoma", CANCER RESEARCH, (20180323), vol. 78, no. 11, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-17-3386, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2886 - 2896, XP055841465 [XP] 1-6,9,10,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-17-3386 | International search | [A]WO2015049650 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP NO 2 LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4* Abstract *; | [X]WO2017117182 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-4 * para [0003], [0012], [0039], [0044-0045] * |