EP3765054 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TARGETING GAMMA DELTA T CELLS WITH CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAYNE, Aimee S. 536 Hamilton Road Merion Station, Pennsylvania 19066 / US | 02 /
ELLEBRECHT, Christoph T. 500 Admirals Way, Apt. 226 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19146 / US | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19741698.5 | 18.01.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019US14227 | Priority number, date | US201862619146P | 19.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862619146 P | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019143961 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3765054 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, C07K16/28, // C07K16/30 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
C07K16/2809 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4631 (EP);
A61K39/4632 (EP);
A61K39/464412 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K14/70517 (EP,US);
C07K14/70578 (US);
A61K2239/28 (EP);
A61K2239/31 (EP);
A61K2239/38 (EP);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM TARGETING VON GAMMA-DELTA-T-ZELLEN MIT CHIMÄREN ANTIGENREZEPTOREN | [2021/03] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TARGETING GAMMA DELTA T CELLS WITH CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS | [2021/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE CIBLAGE DE LYMPHOCYTES T GAMMA DELTA AU MOYEN DE RÉCEPTEURS ANTIGÉNIQUES CHIMÉRIQUES | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/03] | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/03] | 05.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 05.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2020 | Decision despatched | 05.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 05.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 05.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2020 | Decision despatched | 05.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 05.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015132598 (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-22 * claims 1-19 ** the whole document *; | [Y]US2016175358 (JAKOBOVITS AYA [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010]; example 17; claims 14,21, 141,148 *; | [IY]WO2016172606 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) [I] 1-22 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006]; figure 1; claims 1-78 * [Y] 1-22; | [Y] - KOENECKE CHRISTIAN ET AL, "In vivo application of mAb directed against the [gamma][delta] TCR does not deplete but generates "invisible" [gamma][delta] T cells", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20090201), vol. 39, no. 2, doi:10.1002/eji.200838741, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 372 - 379, XP055865175 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * * page 376, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.200838741 | [Y] - JIANHUA ZHOU ET AL, "Anti- TCR antibody-expanded T cells: a better choice for the adoptive immunotherapy of lymphoid malignancies", CELLULAR, London, (20110613), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1038/cmi.2011.16, ISSN 1672-7681, pages 34 - 44, XP055559094 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * * page 37, column r, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 35, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cmi.2011.16 | International search | [A]WO9303151 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB]) [A] 1-47 * entire document *; | [A]WO2008118324 (MACROGENICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * entire document *; | [A]WO2012154201 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * entire document *; | [A]US2014234348 (SCHOLLER NATHALIE [US], et al) [A] 1-47* entire document *; | [Y]WO2016025880 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 6-8, 10, 11, 26, 27, 29 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016175358 (JAKOBOVITS AYA [US], et al) [Y] 36, 37, 39 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2016172606 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) [Y] 43-47 * entire document *; | [XY]WO2016185035 (CELLECTIS [FR]) [X] 1, 9, 12, 13, 15, 18, 21-24, 28, 30-32, 34, 38, 40, 41 * entire document * [Y] 6-8, 10, 11, 16, 17, 19, 20, 26, 27, 29, 33, 35-37, 39, 42-47; | [A]US2017073430 (BOONTANRART MANDY [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * entire document *; | [A]WO2017112741 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-47 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017290858 (ZHAO YANGBING [US], et al) [Y] 42 * entire document *; | [A]WO2017181119 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-47 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017334967 (SIEGEL DONALD L [US], et al) [Y] 16, 17, 19, 20, 33, 35 * entire document *; | [A] - TORIKAI et al., "A Foundation for Universal T- Cell Based Immunotherapy: T Cells Engineered to Express a CD 19-Specific Chimeric-Antigen-Receptor and Eliminate Expression of Endogenous TCR", Blood, (20120614), vol. 119, no. 24, doi:10.1182/blood-2012-01-405365, pages 5697 - 5705, XP055546827 [A] 1-47 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012-01-405365 |