EP3837290 - COMPONENTS AND CATALYSTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Pontaccio 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUIDOTTI, Simona c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le G. Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
LIGUORI, Dario c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le G. Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
MORINI, Giampiero c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le G. Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | 04 /
VITALE, Gianni c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le G. Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | LyondellBasell c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia Intellectual Property P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19742384.1 | 25.07.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019EP70086 | Priority number, date | EP20180188840 | 14.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18188840 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035283 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837290 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3837290 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F4/657 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP);
C07F7/28 (US);
C07F3/02 (US);
C07F9/94 (US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/6465 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/651 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6545 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6574 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPONENTEN UND KATALYSATOREN ZUR POLYMERISIERUNG VON OLEFINEN | [2021/25] | English: | COMPONENTS AND CATALYSTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS | [2021/25] | French: | COMPOSANTS ET CATALYSEURS POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION DES OLÉFINES | [2023/02] |
Former [2021/25] | CONSTITUANTS ET CATALYSEURS POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 05.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | LU | 25.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 11.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4220554 (BARBE PIER C [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [AD]US5007357 (TAKENOYA HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15* illustrative embodiment II *; | [A]WO9844009 (MONTELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * example 2 *; | [AD]WO2017042058 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE ITALIA SRL [IT]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] * | by applicant | US5077357 | EP0713886 | EP0856013 | US7388061 | WO2010078494 | WO2011061134 | WO2017042058 | - C. J. CARMANR. A. HARRINGTONC. E. WILKES, "Monomer Sequence Distribution in Ethylene-Propylene Rubber Measured by 13C NMR. 3. Use of Reaction Probability Mode", Macromolecules, (19770000), vol. 10, page 536 | - M. KAKUGOY. NAITOK. MIZUNUMAT. MIYATAKE, "Carbon-13 NMR determination of monomer sequence distribution in ethylene-propylene copolymers prepared with 5-titanium trichloride-diethylaluminum chloride", Macromolecules, (19820000), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1021/ma00232a037, page 1150, XP001172897 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00232a037 |