EP3976886 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GROUND CONSOLIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FEDERALE DE LAUSANNE (EPFL) EPFL-TTO EPFL Innovation Park J 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2023/25] |
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL) EPFL-TTO EPFL Innovation Park J 1015 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERZIS, Dimitrios Ch. du Cossy 8 1260 Nyon / CH | 02 /
LALOUI, Lyesse Ch. des Clos 59 1024 Ecublens / CH | 03 /
HICHER, Patrick Ch. de la Venoge 3 1028 Préverenges / CH | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Vesterinen, Jussi Tapio LUMI IP GmbH Rodtmattstrasse 45 3014 Bern / CH | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 19742474.0 | 31.05.2019 | [2022/14] | WO2019IB54532 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020240263 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3976886 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3976886 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E02D3/11, E02D3/12, C09K17/42, C09K17/00, C12N1/20 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
E02D3/11 (EP,US);
C09K17/42 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N13/00 (US);
C12N9/80 (US);
C12P3/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | E02D3/11, E02D3/12, C09K17/00, C09K17/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BODENVERFESTIGUNG | [2022/14] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GROUND CONSOLIDATION | [2022/14] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSOLIDATION DE SOL | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 10.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 21.09.2023 | |
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10110426 (OHBAYASHI CORP, et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0070152 (BIOGUARD LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1* page 8, line 12 - page 10, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CN104631430B (UNIV NANJING FORESTRY) [A] 2-4,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104790378B (UNIV HOHAI) [A] 1-29 * abstract * |