EP3801984 - FLOOR TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lagerwaard, Edward Johannes Andromedaring 4 3328 HB Dordrecht / NL | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19743021.8 | 29.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019NL50312 | Priority number, date | NL20182021007 | 29.05.2018 Original published format: NL 2021007 | NL20182021609 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: NL 2021609 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019231323 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3801984 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B24B45/00, A47L11/14, A47L13/00, B24B7/18, B24B47/12, B24B57/02, B24B55/02 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B24B47/12 (EP,US);
B24B7/186 (EP,US);
A47L11/1625 (US);
A47L11/2025 (US);
A47L11/4069 (EP,US);
A47L9/0411 (US);
B24B45/006 (EP,US);
B24B55/04 (EP);
B24B55/102 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | BODENBEHANDLUNGSGERÄT | [2021/15] | English: | FLOOR TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2021/15] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SOL | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 23.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2923107 (LUIGI BIASONI) [X] 1,3,9-11,14,16 * figures 1, 3, 4, 6 * * column 1, lines 14-18 * * column 3, lines 8-23 * [Y] 2,4-7,15; | [Y]US6238277 (DUNCAN C WARREN [US], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2006119518 (PUCHEGGER U BEISTEINER PARKETT [AT], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [Y]CN201077007Y (SHIYU WU [CN]) [Y] 7 * figures 1-2 *; | [XY]EP2036668 (NAT CARPET EQUIPMENT INC [US]) [X] 12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 18] , [0 22] , [0 24]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 4-7,15; | [XY]KR20090030458 (KIM KEUN SIK [KR]) [X] 12,13 * figures 2-5 * [Y] 5,6,15; | [A]US2012270483 (BAE HYUNG SEONG [KR], et al) [A] 9* abstract * |