EP3743103 - INTRANASAL DELIVERY OF A CYCLIC-DI-NUCLEOTIDE ADJUVANTED VACCINE FOR TUBERCULOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANLEY, Sarah 2150 Shattuck Ave., Suite 510 Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 02 /
VAN DIS, Erik 2150 Shattuck Ave., Suite 510 Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 03 /
SOGI, Kimberly 2150 Shattuck Ave., Suite 510 Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 04 /
PORTNOY, Daniel A. 2150 Shattuck Ave., Suite 510 Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 05 /
RAE, Chris 2150 Shattuck Ave., Suite 510 Berkeley, California 94704 / US | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19743417.8 | 19.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019US14380 | Priority number, date | US201862622718P | 26.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862622718 P | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019147509 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743103 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/015, A61K39/04, A61K39/12, A61K39/145, A61P11/00, A61P31/06 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61K39/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/06 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (US);
A61K2039/543 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (US);
A61K2039/55511 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | A61K39/00, A61K39/015, A61K39/04, A61K39/12, A61K39/145 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | INTRANASALE VERABREICHUNG EINES MIT CYCLISCHEM DI-NUKLEOTID ADJUVIERTEN IMPFSTOFFS FÜR TUBERKULOSE | [2020/49] | English: | INTRANASAL DELIVERY OF A CYCLIC-DI-NUCLEOTIDE ADJUVANTED VACCINE FOR TUBERCULOSIS | [2020/49] | French: | ADMINISTRATION INTRANASALE D'UN VACCIN À ADJUVANT DE DI-NUCLÉOTIDE CYCLIQUE POUR LA TUBERCULOSE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 14.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - BAPPADITYA DEY ET AL, "A bacterial cyclic dinucleotide activates the cytosolic surveillance pathway and mediates innate resistance to tuberculosis", NATURE MEDICINE, New York, (20150302), vol. 21, no. 4, doi:10.1038/nm.3813, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 401 - 406, XP055770845 [Y] 1-15 *** abstract, pages 403, 404, Figure 4 *** DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.3813 | [YD] - LETICIA CORRALES ET AL, "Direct Activation of STING in the Tumor Microenvironment Leads to Potent and Systemic Tumor Regression and Immunity", CELL REPORTS, US, (20150501), vol. 11, no. 7, doi:10.1016/j.celrep.2015.04.031, ISSN 2211-1247, pages 1018 - 1030, XP055771217 [YD] 1-15 *** page 1019 left col., page 1023 left col., Figures 3A, 3D *** DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.celrep.2015.04.031 | [AD] - ZVI ANAT ET AL, "Whole genome identification of Mycobacterium tuberculosis vaccine candidates by comprehensive data mining and bioinformatic analyses", BMC MEDICAL GENOMICS, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20080528), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1755-8794, page 18, XP021040901 [AD] 1-15 *** Table 3 *** | International search | [X]WO2017151922 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-4, 19 * entire document *; | [A]WO2017223146 (AERAS [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 19 * entire document *; | [A]WO2016130616 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [A] 1-4, 19 * entire document *; | [PX] - Erik VAN DIS et al., "STING-Activating Adjuvants Elicit a Th17 Immune Response and Protect against Mycobacterium tuberculosis Infection", Cell Reports, (20180615), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 1435 - 1447, XP055627339 [PX] 1-4, 19 * , entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.celrep.2018.04.003 |