EP3744374 - TIGHT-BINDING DEVICE FOR MICRO-NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cosmed Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 32 Kawanishi-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8014 / JP | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAN, Ying-shu c/o COSMED PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 32, Kawanishi-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8014 / JP | 02 /
KAMIYAMA, Fumio c/o COSMED PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 32, Kawanishi-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8014 / JP | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19743817.9 | 23.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019JP02011 | Priority number, date | JP20180023525 | 24.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018023525 | [2020/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019146618 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744374 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/42, A61B5/15, A61M37/00, A61M5/32 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/150022 (EP);
A61M37/0015 (EP,KR,US);
A61M25/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/150068 (EP);
A61B5/150748 (KR);
A61B5/150969 (EP);
A61B5/150984 (EP,KR);
A61M37/0069 (KR);
A61M5/42 (KR);
A61M2025/0206 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0007 (KR);
A61M2037/0023 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | A61M5/42, A61B5/15, A61M37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | FESTBINDENDE VORRICHTUNG FÜR MIKRONADEL | [2020/49] | English: | TIGHT-BINDING DEVICE FOR MICRO-NEEDLE | [2020/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON ÉTANCHE POUR MICRO-AIGUILLE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2020 | Translation filed | 08.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 02.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]WO2016072060 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0027]-[0050], fig. 1-8 & US 2017/0239457 A1, paragraphs [0036]-[0072], fig. 1-8 * [Y] 5-8; | [Y]JP2003534881 (BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY) [Y] 5-8 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0036], fig. 1-11 & US 6537242 B1, page 4, line 10 to page 10, line 25, fig. 1-11 & WO 2001/093931 A1 & EP 1289588 A1 *; | [Y]JP2000237171 (TEIJIN LTD) [Y] 5-8 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0036], fig. 1-7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH08140990 (NICHIBAN KK) [Y] 7-8 * , paragraphs [0006]-[0032], fig. 1-13 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008509712 (IMPERIAL INNOVATIONS LTD.) [A] 8 * , paragraphs [0007]-[0025], fig. 1, 2 & US 2007/0250109 A1, paragraphs [0007]-[0043], fig. 1, 2 & WO 2006/015987 A1 & GB 417949 D0 & EP 1796556 A1 * | by applicant | JP2004510530 | JP4198985B | JP2004510534 | JP4104975B | JP2004510535 | JP4659332B | JP2005533625 | JP2006500973 | JP2007509706 | JP4682144B | JP2011078711 | JP2014042788 | JP6091818B | JP2000237171 | JPS5852280B |