EP3677426 - ANTI-REFLECTIVE FILM, POLARIZING PLATE AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYUN, Jinseok LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Jung Hyun LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Kwangseok LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHANG, Yeongrae LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 19744437.5 | 15.01.2019 | [2020/28] | WO2019KR00602 | Priority number, date | KR20180009002 | 24.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180009002 | [2020/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019146949 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677426 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/20, G02B1/11, G02B5/30, G02B1/111 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G02B1/111 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,KR);
G02B1/11 (KR);
G02B1/14 (US);
G02B5/3025 (KR);
B32B2307/416 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | B32B27/20, G02B1/11, G02B5/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | ANTIREFLEXIONSFILM, POLARISATIONSPLATTE UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/28] | English: | ANTI-REFLECTIVE FILM, POLARIZING PLATE AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/28] | French: | FILM ANTIREFLET, PLAQUE DE POLARISATION ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2020 | Translation filed | 01.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 24.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013265529 (WAKIZAKA DAIKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0018] , [0068] - [0071] - [0078] - [0081] - [0087] - [0088]; table 4 *; | [A]US2016304722 (KOBORI SHIGETO [JP]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [X]EP3163336 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 3,5-11 * paragraphs [0022] , [0000] , [0164] , [0219]; figures 1c,13 *; | [E]EP3733745 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0044] , [0045] * | International search | [Y]KR20060031941 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]) [Y] 2 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0033]. *; | [A]KR20160002409 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11* See abstract; paragraphs [0073]-[0075], [0153]; and figures 2-9 . *; | [Y]JP2016155992 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * See paragraphs [0064], [0065], [0067]-[0071]; and figure 2. *; | [Y]KR20170086477 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [Y] 9 * See claim 1. *; | [Y]KR20170141169 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-11 * See paragraphs [0002], [0037], [0038], [0041], [0074], [0101], [0200]; table 2; and claim 1. * | by applicant | KR20180009002 |