EP3834240 - BATTERIES HAVING VENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duracell U.S. Operations, Inc. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHBOLT, Mark 14 Research Drive Berkshire Corporate Park Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 02 /
SHELEKHIN, Alexander 14 Research Drive Berkshire Corporate Park Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 03 /
MERRILL, Brien 14 Research Drive Berkshire Corporate Park Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 04 /
PODOPRIGORA, Oleg 14 Research Drive Berkshire Corporate Park Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 05 /
FERRIN, Robert, S. 14 Research Drive Berkshire Corporate Park Bethel, CT 06801 / US | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19745883.9 | 09.07.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019US40905 | Priority number, date | US201816058735 | 08.08.2018 Original published format: US201816058735 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020033090 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3834240 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/12, H01M2/04 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
H01M50/342 (EP);
H01M50/3425 (EP,US);
H01M10/24 (EP);
H01M10/28 (EP);
H01M50/14 (EP,US);
H01M50/152 (EP,US);
H01M50/169 (US);
H01M50/182 (US);
H01M50/548 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | BATTERIEN MIT ENTLÜFTUNGEN | [2021/24] | English: | BATTERIES HAVING VENTS | [2021/24] | French: | BATTERIES DOTÉES D'ÉVENTS | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 10.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007009785 (KOZUKI KIYOMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15,17-23 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 10] - [0015] - [0 27] - [0057]; figures 1-8 * [I] 8,16; | [XI]US2009111003 (KIM YOOK-YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15,17-23 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 41] - [0071]; figures 1A,B,C,D,E,F,G, 2A, 3A *[I] 8,16; | [XI]EP2337110 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,9-15,17-23 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 5] - [0013] - [0 63] - [0099]; figures 1-17 * [I] 8,16; | [XI]US2017110699 (KOHIRA KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,13-15,17-23 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 8] - [0055]; figures 1A,B, 2 * [I] 8,11,12,16 |