EP3821061 - ANTIMICROBIAL POLYMER RESINS, FIBERS, AND YARNS WITH ZINC AND PHOSPHORUS CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ascend Performance Materials Operations LLC 1010 Travis Street Suite 900 Houston TX 77002 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSBORN, Scott E. 2225 Brookpark Road Pensacola, Florida 32534 / US | 02 /
YUNG, Wai-Shing 8823 Spider Lily Way Pensacola, Florida 32526 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19746291.4 | 12.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019US41561 | Priority number, date | US201862697786P | 13.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862697786 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020014585 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821061 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D01F1/10, C08K3/02, C08K3/08 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
C08K3/02 (EP,KR);
D01F1/103 (EP,KR,US);
C08L77/02 (KR,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/0023 (KR,US);
D01F6/60 (EP,KR);
D01F6/90 (KR,US);
D01F9/08 (KR,US);
D06P3/241 (EP,KR);
C08K2003/026 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/0893 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2203/12 (KR,US);
D06M2101/34 (KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/02, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08K3/08, C08L77/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE POLYMERHARZE, FASERN UND GARNE MIT ZINK- UND PHOSPHORGEHALT | [2021/20] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL POLYMER RESINS, FIBERS, AND YARNS WITH ZINC AND PHOSPHORUS CONTENT | [2021/20] | French: | RÉSINES POLYMÈRES ANTIMICROBIENNES, FIBRES ET FILS CONTENANT DU ZINC ET DU PHOSPHORE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 11.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4701518 (OSBORN SCOTT E [US], et al); | [XI]US6013275 (KONAGAYA SHIGEJI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4701518 | US5411710 | US6584668 | US2018371656 |