EP3834572 - USER EQUIPMENT AND BASE STATION INVOLVED IN IMPROVED DISCONTINUED RECEPTION FOR UNLICENSED CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAH, Rikin c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
TAO, Ming-Hung c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
SUZUKI, Hidetoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540--6207 / JP | 04 /
BHAMRI, Ankit c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 05 /
KUANG, Quan c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19746501.6 | 05.08.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019EP71028 | Priority number, date | EP20180188260 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18188260 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020030595 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3834572 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/0808, H04W76/28, // H04W52/02 | [2024/45] | CPC: |
H04W74/0808 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | H04W74/08, H04W76/28, H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT UND BASISSTATION, DIE AN EINEM VERBESSERTEN UNTERBROCHENEN EMPFANG FÜR UNLIZENZIERTE ZELLEN BETEILIGT SIND | [2021/24] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT AND BASE STATION INVOLVED IN IMPROVED DISCONTINUED RECEPTION FOR UNLICENSED CELLS | [2021/24] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET STATION DE BASE IMPLIQUÉS DANS UNE RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE (DRX) AMÉLIORÉE POUR CELLULES SANS LICENCE | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 11.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2621242 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2016072787 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [YA]EP3079436 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | [XAYI]WO2016164202 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC [US]); |