EP3749705 - COPOLYMERS OF ESTER AND ETHER UNITS, PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING SAME AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMMARIEU, Basile 7 Rue des Deux Ponts, App. 8 75004 Paris / FR | 02 /
DAIGLE, Jean-Christophe 270 Cicot, St-Bruno-de-Montarville Québec J3V 1V7 / CA | 03 /
JALBERT, Pierre-Michel 1683 Avenue de la Salle Montréal Québec H1V 2J9 / CA | 04 /
LAJOIE, Gilles 220 des Semailles Varennes Québec J3X 1Y4 / CA | 05 /
GAGNON, Catherine 1527A Rue Principale Sainte-Julie Québec J3E 2P8 / CA | 06 /
GUERFI, Abdelbast 8655 Rivard Brossard Québec J4X 1W2 / CA | 07 /
ARMAND, Michel 8 Rue Daguerre 75014 Paris / FR | 08 /
ZAGHIB, Karim 2006 Rue Marcelle Ferron Longueuil Québec J4N 1T8 / CA | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19747279.8 | 05.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019CA50145 | Priority number, date | CA20182994005 | 05.02.2018 Original published format: CA 2994005 | [2020/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019148299 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749705 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/66, C08J3/24, C08L67/00, H01M10/0565, H01M4/137, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/054, H01M10/0525, C08F290/06, C08G63/91, B32B27/32 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
C08F299/0492 (EP);
C08F290/061 (KR,US);
C08F220/06 (US);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C08G63/08 (EP,US);
C08G63/66 (KR,US);
C08G63/664 (EP);
C08G63/912 (EP);
C08G65/2603 (US);
C08J3/24 (EP,KR);
C08L51/08 (KR);
C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L67/02 (KR);
H01G11/56 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/054 (EP);
H01M10/0565 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/137 (KR);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M4/622 (EP);
C08J2367/04 (EP);
H01M2300/0082 (EP);
H01M2300/0091 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | C08G63/66, C08J3/24, C08L67/00, H01M10/0565, H01M4/137, H01M4/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | COPOLYMERE VON ESTER- UND ETHEREINHEITEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/51] | English: | COPOLYMERS OF ESTER AND ETHER UNITS, PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING SAME AND USES THEREOF | [2020/51] | French: | COPOLYMÈRES D'UNITÉS ESTER ET ÉTHER, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 30.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CA2478659 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]); | [XA]WO2007012979 (UNIV GENEVE [CH], et al); |