EP3746559 - METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR THE BIOSYNTHESIS OF BETA HYDROXY FATTY ACID ANIONS AND/OR DERIVATIVES THEREOF AND/OR COMPOUNDS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVISTA Textiles (U.K.) Limited 20 Gresham Street, 4th Floor London EC2V 7JE / GB | [2023/45] |
Former [2020/50] | For all designated states INVISTA Textiles (U.K.) Limited One St. Peter's Square Manchester M2 3DE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMBE, Jonathan, Paul Wilton Centre Redcar TS10 4RF / GB | 02 /
FOSTER, Alexander, Brett Wilton Centre Redcar TS10 4RF / GB | 03 /
BARMAN, Arghya Wilton Centre Redcar TS10 4RF / GB | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Duffield, Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19747386.1 | 01.02.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019US16211 | Priority number, date | US201862624910P | 01.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862624910 P | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019152753 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746559 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12N15/74, C12P7/42 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
C12N9/1029 (EP,US);
C12P7/42 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (US);
C12N15/52 (EP);
C12N9/90 (EP,US);
C12P7/625 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN ZUR BIOSYNTHESE VON BETA-HYDROXYFETTSÄUREANIONEN UND / ODER DEREN DERIVATEN UND DAVON ABGELEITETEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2020/50] | English: | METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR THE BIOSYNTHESIS OF BETA HYDROXY FATTY ACID ANIONS AND/OR DERIVATIVES THEREOF AND/OR COMPOUNDS RELATED THERETO | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET MATÉRIAUX POUR LA BIOSYNTHÈSE D'ANIONS D'ACIDE GRAS BÊTA HYDROXY ET/OU DE DÉRIVÉS DE CEUX-CI ET/OU DE COMPOSÉS ASSOCIÉS À CEUX-CI | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI] - Weichler Maria-Teresa ET AL, "Thermophilic Coenzyme B12 -Dependent Acyl Coenzyme A (CoA) Mutase from Kyrpidia tusciae DSM 2912 Preferentially Catalyzes Isomerization of (R)-3-Hydroxybutyryl-CoA and 2-Hydroxyisobutyryl- CoA", Biol Chem, (20150701), pages 4564 - 4572, URL: https://doi.org/10.1128/AEM.00716-15, (20211110), XP055859843 [XD] 1-4,6-9,11 * abstract; Fig. 2; Fig. 3; page 4568, col. 1 last par.;page 4569, col. 1 par. 2 * [I] 5,10 | [XDI] - ROHDE MARIA-TERESA ET AL, "Production of 2-Hydroxyisobutyric Acid from Methanol by Methylobacterium extorquens AM1 Expressing ( R )-3-Hydroxybutyryl Coenzyme A-Isomerizing Enzymes", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 83, no. 3, doi:10.1128/AEM.02622-16, ISSN 0099-2240, (20170201), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC5244315/pdf/e02622-16.pdf, XP055859849 [XD] 1-4,6-9,11 * abstract; page 2, par. 2; page 12, par. 3 line 6 and Figs. 1, 2 * [I] 5,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02622-16 | [AD] - PRZYBYLSKI DENISE ET AL, "Synthesis of the building block 2-hydroxyisobutyrate from fructose and butyrate by Cupriavidus necator H16", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, vol. 97, no. 20, doi:10.1007/S00253-013-5064-X, ISSN 0175-7598, (20130815), pages 8875 - 8885, (20130815), XP035328791 [AD] 1-11 * abstract; Fig. 1; page 8880, col.1 last paragraph-col. 2 line 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-013-5064-x | International search | [XY]US2011171702 (REINECKE LIV [DE], et al) [X] 1, 2, 6, 11, 12, 16, 29-32 * entire document * [Y] 3-5, 7-9, 13-15, 17-19; | [Y]WO2014044674 (HELMHOLTZ ZENTRUM UMWELTFORSCH [DE]) [Y] 5, 9, 15, 19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015267231 (HAAS THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 22 * entire document *; | [A]US2016208293 (BURGARD ANTHONY P [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 11-19, 22, 29-32* entire document *; | [Y]US2017101631 (KOEPKE MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 3-5, 9, 13-15, 19, 22 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017145441 (CONRADIE ALEX VAN ECK [GB]) [Y] 7, 8, 17, 18 * entire document * |