EP3726574 - CONNECTION TERMINAL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN CORPORATION 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2022/13] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOTTA, Yutaka c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
OSUKA, Shinya c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 03 /
KUME, Yasuhiro c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 19747928.0 | 16.01.2019 | [2020/43] | WO2019JP01095 | Priority number, date | JP20180015928 | 31.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018015928 | JP20180158291 | 27.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018158291 | [2020/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019150950 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726574 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48, H01L25/07, H01L25/18, H01R12/71, H05K1/14, H05K7/14, H01L23/31, H01R12/58, H01R13/405, H01R13/504, H01R13/631, // B29C45/00, H01L23/495, H01L23/498, H02M7/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L23/49811 (EP,US);
H01L23/3135 (EP);
H01L23/49838 (US);
H01L24/37 (EP,US);
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H05K3/301 (EP,US);
H05K3/308 (EP,US);
H05K3/3447 (EP,US);
H05K7/14 (EP);
H01L2224/131 (EP);
H01L2224/13294 (EP);
H01L2224/13339 (EP);
H01L2224/16238 (EP);
H01L2224/3701 (EP);
H01L2224/37012 (EP);
H01L2224/40137 (EP);
H01L2224/73205 (EP);
H01L2224/73253 (EP);
H01L2224/73255 (EP);
H01L2224/73263 (EP);
H01L2224/811 (EP);
H01L2224/81192 (EP);
H01L24/13 (EP);
H01L24/16 (EP);
H01L24/40 (EP);
H01L24/81 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP);
H01L2224/13294, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/13339, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/3701, H01L2924/00012 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSKLEMMENEINHEIT | [2020/43] | English: | CONNECTION TERMINAL UNIT | [2020/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE BORNE DE CONNEXION | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2020 | Translation filed | 14.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 14.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPS50125072U (NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.) [X] 1,2,5-8,11 * paragraph [0001]; figures 3, 4; claim 1 * [Y] 9 [I] 10,12,13; | [A]WO2014050278 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [A] 10* description of fig. 5b;; figure 5b *; | [XYI]US2016035646 (SOYANO SHIN [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0129]; figures 12-15 * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0141]; figures 19-24 * [Y] 9 [I] 10 | International search | [Y]JPS50125072U (NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.) [Y] 5-7, 11-13 * , specification, page 3, line 4 to page 4, line 1, fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH0385655U (FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [Y] 5, 6, 8, 9 * , specification, page 1, line 18 to page 2, line 18, fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH05259334 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) [Y] 5-7 * , paragraphs [0009]-[0011], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010160916 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 11-13* , paragraphs [0013]-[0016], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010176922 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [Y] 11-13 * , paragraphs [0022]-[0031], fig. 1-5 (Family: none) *; | [XY]WO2015045648 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4, 10 * , paragraphs [0017], [0063]-[0074], [0092]-[0105], fig. 12, 13, 25-32 & US 2016/0035646 A1, paragraphs [0059], [0112]-[0123], [0144]-[0161], fig. 12(a), 12(b), 13, 25-32 & CN 105122446 A * [Y] 5-9, 11-13; | [Y]JP2017050326 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [Y] 11-13 * , paragraph [0034], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2017208382 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 11-13 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0017], fig. 1-3 & US 2017/0330810 A1, paragraphs [0032]-[0040], fig. 1-3 & DE 102017207382 A1 & CN 107403793 A * | by applicant | JP2011253942 |