EP3746337 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PROVIDING BLUETOOTH -BASED PASSIVE ENTRY AND PASSIVE START (PEPS) FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strattec Security Corporation 3333 West Good Hope Road Milwaukee Wisconsin 53209 / US | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALAH, Abdel, H. 5860 Glen Haven Drive Greendale, WI 53129 / US | 02 /
RAMAKRISHNA, Prahlad Narasimhamurthy 764 Pradhvaya Nilaya 1st Cross SRS Road Peenya 1st Stage Bangalore, KA 560058 / IN | 03 /
MALLIPUDI, Nayudu 1-7/1, Balantram, East Godavari District Kakinada, AP 533263 / IN | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19748422.3 | 01.02.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019US16344 | Priority number, date | US201862625179P | 01.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862625179 P | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019152836 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746337 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/24, F02N11/08, H04W4/80, G01S11/06, G01S13/04, G07C9/00 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G01S5/0284 (EP);
B60R25/24 (EP,US);
B60R25/209 (US);
B60R25/245 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP);
H04W12/08 (EP);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W4/48 (EP,US);
B60R2325/101 (EP,US);
B60R2325/108 (EP,US);
B60R2325/205 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00793 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | B60R25/24, F02N11/08, H04W4/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON BLUETOOTH-BASIERTEM PASSIVE ENTRY/PASSIVE START (PEPS) FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2020/50] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PROVIDING BLUETOOTH -BASED PASSIVE ENTRY AND PASSIVE START (PEPS) FOR A VEHICLE | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR FOURNIR UNE ENTRÉE PASSIVE ET UN DÉMARRAGE PASSIF (PEPS) BASÉS SUR LE BLUETOOTH POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 20.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014188309 (CARATTO DANILO [IT], et al) [X] 21,35,38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0057] , [0 86] * [I] 22-34,36,37,39,40; | [XI]US2014240091 (TALTY TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 21,22,30-33,35,36,38,39 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0028] , [0 30] , [0 33] , [0 36] * [I] 23-29,34,37,40; | [XI]US2016320469 (LAIFENFELD MOSHE [IL], et al) [X] 21,35,38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0 23] - [0025] - [0027] , [0 30] *[I] 23,27,28,30-33; | [XI]WO2017062448 (HUF NORTH AMERICA AUTOMOTIVE PARTS MFG CORP [US]) [X] 21,35,38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0028] * [I] 22-34,36,37,39,40; | [XI]WO2017181035 (HUF NORTH AMERICA AUTOMOTIVE PARTS MFG CORP [US]) [X] 21,35,38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] , [0060] * [I] 22-34,36,37,39,40; | [XI]WO2017191480 (DURA AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS [FR]) [X] 21,35,38 * abstract * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 13 * * page 9, lines 3-27 * [I] 22-34,36,37,39,40 | International search | [A]US2012136511 (DICKERHOOF GREG [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2014188309 (CARATTO DANILO [IT], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014240091 (TALTY TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015332532 (LEE KIHO [KR], et al) [Y] 9 * entire document, especially: para [0002], [0048] *; | [XY]US2016320469 (LAIFENFELD MOSHE [IL], et al) [X] 1-8, 10-20 * entire document, especially: fig 3, para [0001], [0011], [0022]-[0029] * [Y] 9 | by applicant | US2014240091 |