EP3830946 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE SYSTEM, AND DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WACKER, Maik Nibelungenstr. 85 76684 Östringen / DE | 02 /
STARK, Marcel Waldstrasse 3 74909 Meckesheim / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19748663.2 | 19.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019EP25239 | Priority number, date | DE20181005932 | 30.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018005932 | [2021/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020025164 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830946 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3830946 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02P3/22, H02M1/36, H02P29/032, H02P5/74, H02M1/12, H02M1/15, H02M1/32, H02M5/458 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H02P3/22 (EP,KR);
H02P27/06 (KR,US);
H02M1/0012 (EP,KR);
H02M1/008 (EP,KR);
H02M1/12 (EP,KR);
H02M1/15 (EP,KR);
H02M1/32 (EP,KR);
H02M5/458 (EP,KR);
H02M5/4585 (US);
H02M7/797 (US);
H02P29/032 (EP,KR);
H02P5/74 (EP,KR);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | H02P3/22, H02P5/74, H02P29/032, H02M1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ANTRIEBSSYSTEMS UND ANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2021/23] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE SYSTEM, AND DRIVE SYSTEM | [2021/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ET SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 20.12.2023 | |
GR | 21.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006092057 (SLAVIN KEITH R [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2009251081 (THUNES JERRY DEE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12 * the whole document * [A] 4,14 [I] 3,13,15; | [IA]EP2112760 (ABB OY [FI]) [I] 1-3,5-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 4,14; | [A]EP2631104 (ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |