EP3824100 - POLYNUCLEOTIDE SYNTHESIS METHOD, KIT AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford Nanopore Technologies plc Gosling Building Edmund Halley Road Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4DQ / GB | [2023/17] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states Oxford Nanopore Technologies plc Suite 14 Science Village Chesterford Research Park Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB10 1XL / GB | ||
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states Oxford Nanopore Technologies Limited Suite 14 Science Village Chesterford Research Park Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB10 1XL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILTON, John C/O OXFORD NANOPORE TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED Suite 14 Science Village Chesterford Research Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB10 1XL / GB | 02 /
NAYYAR, Sobia C/O OXFORD NANOPORE TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED Suite 14 Science Village Chesterford Research Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB10 1XL / GB | 03 /
RIEDL, Jan C/O OXFORD NANOPORE TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED Suite 14 Science Village Chesterford Research Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB10 1XL / GB | 04 /
OGAKI, Ryosuke C/O OXFORD NANOPORE TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED Suite 14 Science Village Chesterford Research Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB10 1XL / GB | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19748892.7 | 19.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019GB52035 | Priority number, date | GB20180011810 | 19.07.2018 Original published format: GB 201811810 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020016604 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824100 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6844, B01L3/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6844 (EP);
C12Q1/6855 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2521/101, C12Q2521/501, C12Q2521/531, C12Q2525/101, C12Q2525/186, C12Q2525/301, C12Q2537/162, C12Q2563/157, C12Q2563/159 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | POLYNUKLEOTIDSYNTHESEVERFAHREN, KIT UND SYSTEM | [2021/21] | English: | POLYNUCLEOTIDE SYNTHESIS METHOD, KIT AND SYSTEM | [2021/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, KIT ET SYSTÈME DE SYNTHÈSE DE POLYNUCLÉOTIDES | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 04.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0188173 (HERCULES INC [US]); | [I]WO2012078312 (GEN9 INC [US], et al); | [I]US2013085073 (MEULEMAN WOUTER [GB], et al); | [XP]WO2018134616 (OXFORD NANOPORE TECH LTD [GB]); | by applicant | US8653832 | US2014197028 | US2014202863 | US8828336 | US2014363852 | US2016046973 | WO2016034807 | US2016108382 | US2016168611 | WO2016128731 | WO2016139477 | WO2017009663 | WO2013GB52767 | WO2014GB52736 | WO2015GB50140 |