EP3824567 - TRANSMISSION OF CSI REPORT TO BASE STATION FOR EIRP-CONSTRAINED TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
FAKOORIAN, Seyed Ali Akbar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LIU, Chih-Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19749060.0 | 17.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019US42212 | Priority number, date | US201862700008P | 18.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862700008 P | US201916513010 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: US201916513010 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020018671 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824567 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3824567 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0417, H04B7/06, H04B17/10, H04B17/318, H04W52/36, H04W52/42 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP);
H04B7/0626 (EP,US);
H04B17/102 (EP);
H04B17/309 (US);
H04B17/318 (EP);
H04B7/0456 (US);
H04B7/0645 (EP);
H04W52/18 (US);
H04W52/367 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | H04B7/06, H04B7/0417 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES CSI-BERICHTS AN EINE BASISSTATION FÜR ÜBERTRAGUNGEN MIT EIRP-EINSCHRÄNKUNG | [2023/32] | English: | TRANSMISSION OF CSI REPORT TO BASE STATION FOR EIRP-CONSTRAINED TRANSMISSIONS | [2021/21] | French: | TRANSMISSION D'UN RAPPORT CSI À UNE STATION DE BASE POUR TRANSMISSIONS AVEC UNE CONTRAINTE DE EIRP | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/21] | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON CSI BERICHT AN EINE BASISSTATION FÜR EIRP-EINGEHENDE ÜBERTRAGUNGEN | ||
Former [2021/21] | TRANSMISSION DE RAPPORT DE CSI À UNE STATION DE BASE DESTINÉE À DES TRANSMISSIONS À CONTRAINTE EIRP | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 04.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Cited in | Examination | WO2019099857 |