EP3616723 - USE OF NICOTINIC ACID OR PRAZOSIN FOR TREATING MYOPIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/10] | METHOD FOR TREATING MYOPIA AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN PREPARING DRUG | ||
[2024/16] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wenzhou Medical University PO Box 006 No. 38 Dongfang South Road Ouhai Economic Development Zone Wenzhou, Zhejiang 325000 / CN | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Xiangtian PO Box 006 No.38 South Dongfang Road Ouhai Economic Development Zone Wenzhou Zhejiang 325000 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Sen PO Box 006 No.38 South Dongfang Road Ouhai Economic Development Zone Wenzhou Zhejiang 325000 / CN | 03 /
QU, Jia PO Box 006 No.38 South Dongfang Road Ouhai Economic Development Zone Wenzhou Zhejiang 325000 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Guoyun PO Box 006 No.38 South Dongfang Road Ouhai Economic Development Zone Wenzhou Zhejiang 325000 / CN | 05 /
ZHAO, Fei PO Box 006 No.38 South Dongfang Road Ouhai Economic Development Zone Wenzhou Zhejiang 325000 / CN | 06 /
ZHOU, Xuan PO Box 006 No.38 South Dongfang Road Ouhai Economic Development Zone Wenzhou Zhejiang 325000 / CN | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 19749168.1 | 22.03.2019 | [2020/10] | WO2019CN79184 | Priority number, date | CN201810787541 | 18.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810787541 | [2020/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020015377 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616723 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3616723 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/517, A61K31/455, A61P27/10, A61K36/236, A61K36/537, A61K36/488 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/455 (EP);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K31/517 (EP);
A61K36/236 (EP);
A61K36/488 (EP);
A61K36/537 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/236, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/488, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/537, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | A61K31/517, A61K31/455, A61P27/10, A61K36/236, A61K36/537 | ||
Former IPC [2020/10] | A61K45/00, A61K31/455, A61K31/517, A61P27/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON NIKOTINSÄURE ODER PRAZOSIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MYOPIE | [2024/16] | English: | USE OF NICOTINIC ACID OR PRAZOSIN FOR TREATING MYOPIA | [2024/16] | French: | UTILISATION D'ACIDE NICOTINIQUE OU DE PRAZOSINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MYOPIE | [2024/16] |
Former [2020/10] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MYOPIE UND ANWENDUNG BEI DER HERSTELLUNG EINES MEDIKAMENTS | ||
Former [2020/10] | METHOD FOR TREATING MYOPIA AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN PREPARING DRUG | ||
Former [2020/10] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE LA MYOPIE ET SON APPLICATION DANS LA PRÉPARATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2019 | Translation filed | 14.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 10.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN1128656 (YAO ZUOYU [CN]); | [X]WO0054773 (NITROMED INC [US], et al); | [X]CN1309971 (YIN WEIPING [CN]); | [X]WO0224191 (YONG GUANG PHARMACEUTICAL CO L [CN], et al); | [X]WO2016171282 (UNIV KEIO [JP]) | International search | [X]CN1500494 (ZHANG SHUQING [CN]); | [X]CN1878569 (ALLERGAN INC [US]); | [A]CN102552091 (JIE LIANG); | [A]CN107320725 (UNIV WENZHOU MEDICAL) |