EP3827137 - HYDRAULIC BYPASS CIRCUIT FOR A POWER MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doosan Bobcat North America, Inc. 250 East Beaton Drive West Fargo, ND 58078 / US | [2024/01] |
Former [2021/22] | For all designated states Clark Equipment Company 250 East Beaton Drive West Fargo, ND 58078-6000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Charles 4217 High Creek Road Bismarck, ND 58503 / US | 02 /
COOMBS, Jason R. 1300 Hwy 1800 S Bismarck, ND 58504 / US | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19750206.5 | 25.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019US43453 | Priority number, date | US201862703215P | 25.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862703215 P | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020023756 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827137 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3827137 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/43, E02F9/20, E02F9/22, F04B49/06, F15B11/042, F15B11/08, G05B13/02 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
E02F9/2235 (EP,KR,US);
E02F3/431 (EP,KR);
F15B13/06 (KR,US);
B66F9/22 (KR,US);
E02F3/651 (KR,US);
E02F3/84 (KR,US);
E02F9/20 (EP,KR);
E02F9/2282 (EP,KR);
E02F9/2296 (EP,KR);
F15B11/0426 (EP,KR);
F15B13/022 (KR,US);
F15B21/085 (KR);
F15B2211/20546 (EP,KR);
F15B2211/30565 (EP,KR,US);
F15B2211/30585 (KR,US);
F15B2211/351 (EP,KR);
F15B2211/40561 (EP,KR);
F15B2211/41572 (EP,KR);
F15B2211/45 (KR,US);
F15B2211/455 (EP,KR);
F15B2211/665 (EP,KR);
F15B2211/6654 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHER BYPASS FÜR EINE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2021/22] | English: | HYDRAULIC BYPASS CIRCUIT FOR A POWER MACHINE | [2021/22] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DÉRIVATION HYDRAULIQUE DESTINÉ À UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2023 | CZ | 15.02.2023 | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | NL | 15.02.2023 | PL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SE | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | IE | 25.07.2023 | LU | 25.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.02.2023 | |
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013318958 (COOMBS JASON R [US], et al) [A] 1,7* abstract *; | [X]EP3026243 (SUMITOMO SHI CONSTR MACH CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0139]; figures 12,14 * |