EP3750097 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DECENTRALIZED DATA STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medicapture, Inc. 2250 Hickory Road Suite 200 Plymouth Meeting, Pennsylvania 19462 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YURUSOV, Alexander 3F-7, No. 120, Qiaohe Road, Zhonghe New Taipei City, 235 / TW | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elisabethenstrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19751013.4 | 06.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019US16861 | Priority number, date | US201862627456P | 07.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862627456 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019157062 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750097 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60, G06F21/62, H04L29/06 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G06F21/6245 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (US);
G06F21/606 (US);
G06F21/6218 (EP);
G06F21/78 (US);
H04L63/0428 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Validation states | MA | 03.09.2020 | TN | 03.09.2020 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEZENTRALISIERTE DATENSPEICHERUNG | [2020/51] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DECENTRALIZED DATA STORAGE | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE DÉCENTRALISÉ DE DONNÉES | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 19.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 03.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.05.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2013290703 (RESCH JASON K [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0287] - paragraph [0288] * * paragraph [0290] * * paragraph [0344]; figure 48A * * paragraph [0350] - paragraph [0351] * * paragraph [0352] * * paragraph [0353] * [A] 1-4,6-11; | [YA]US2015154418 (REDBERG DAVID A [US]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0065]; figure 3A * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069]; figures 4A-C * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076]; figure 5 *[A] 1-8,10,11; | [IAY]US2016241525 (KLUM R DAREN [US], et al) [I] 1,11 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044]; figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0063] * [A] 2-5,7,8 [Y] 6,9,10; | [IAY]US2017048021 (YANOVSKY DAVID [EE], et al) [I] 1,11 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0063]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0065]; figures 4A-4B * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0130] * [A] 2,3,5-10 [Y] 4; | [XYI]US2017104736 (SEUL MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,11 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0143]; figures 5, 6 * [Y] 4-6,9,10 [I] 5,8 | International search | [Y]US2007006322 (KARIMZADEH MANSOUR A [US], et al) [Y] 9, 19* ; paragraph [0089] *; | [Y]US2009077390 (COBELO PARTICIO LUCAS [US], et al) [Y] 3, 13 * ; paragraphs [0047], [0052], [0063] *; | [Y]US2013290703 (RESCH JASON K [US], et al) [Y] 5, 15 * ; paragraphs [0119], [0120], [0262], [0351] *; | [Y]US2016241525 (KLUM R DAREN [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * ; paragraphs [0030], [0040], [0042], [0052], claim 4 of CRAM WORLDWIDE *; | [Y]US2017048021 (YANOVSKY DAVID [EE], et al) [Y] 2-5, 7, 8, 10, 12-15, 17, 18, 20 * ; paragraphs [0067], [0069], [0089] *; | [Y]US2017098096 (REDBERG DAVID A [US]) [Y] 1-20 * ; paragraphs [0055], [0078], [0092] * |