EP3751182 - SOLENOID VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Denshi Kabushiki Kaisha 1248 Shimokagemori Chichibu-shi, Saitama 369-1892 / JP | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KON, Hisashi c/o Canon Denshi Kabushiki Kaisha 1248, Shimokagemori Chichibu-shi, Saitama 369-1892 / JP | 02 /
HAGIWARA, Youichi c/o Canon Denshi Kabushiki Kaisha 1248, Shimokagemori Chichibu-shi, Saitama 369-1892 / JP | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19751529.9 | 29.01.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019JP02846 | Priority number, date | JP20180022362 | 09.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018022362 | [2020/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019155932 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3751182 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
F16K31/0655 (EP,US);
F16K1/38 (US);
F16K1/42 (US);
F16K31/0634 (US);
F16K31/0696 (EP,US);
F16K2200/302 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | MAGNETVENTIL | [2020/51] | English: | SOLENOID VALVE | [2020/51] | French: | ÉLECTROVANNE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2020 | Translation filed | 13.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/06] | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2934090 (KENANN JOHN G, et al) [X] 9 * column 1, line 70 - column 4, line 71; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3179123 (SLAWOMIR KOWALSKI, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 51 - column 4, line 63; figures 1-2 *; | [XDI]US3368791 (LEON WELLS DAVID) [XD] 1-4 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 56; figures 1-4 * [I] 5-8; | [A]US3472483 (JANCZUR ZBIGNIW J) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 63; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]US4442998 (OHYAMA TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 39 - column 5, line 42; figures 1-2 * [Y] 5-8; | [A]US4971290 (DAHLMANN GERD-UWE [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 9 - column 6, line 44; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2004163722 (CORNEA MARIUS [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]JP2008053148 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD, et al) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [Y]US2017211699 (SASANUMA KYOHEI [JP], et al) [Y] 5-8 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1-11 * | International search | [Y]US3368791 (LEON WELLS DAVID) [Y] 1-9 * , column 1, line 61 to column 2, line 29, fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS62194886U (SHINKANSAI BEARING KK) [Y] 1-9* , page 9, line 19 to page 10, line 5, fig. 6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2008053148 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD, et al) [Y] 1-9 * , fig. 2, paragraph [0029] (Family: none) * | by applicant | US3368791 | JP2018022362 |