EP3738223 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WIDEBAND CSI REPORTING IN AN ADVANCED WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Md Saifur Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
WANG, Yuyang Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
ONGGOSANUSI, Eko Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/02] |
Former [2020/47] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19752039.8 | 08.02.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019KR01594 | Priority number, date | US201862628517P | 09.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862628517 P | US201862719887P | 20.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862719887 P | US201916266959 | 04.02.2019 Original published format: US201916266959 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019156512 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738223 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3738223 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L1/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H04B7/0626 (EP,US);
H04L1/0008 (US);
H04B17/309 (US);
H04B7/0639 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP);
H04L1/0028 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MELDUNG VON BREITBANDIGEM CSI IN EINEM ERWEITERTEN DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2020/47] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WIDEBAND CSI REPORTING IN AN ADVANCED WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SIGNALEMENT CSI EN LARGE BANDE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL AVANCÉ | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 07.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2019 | AL | 12.01.2022 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | IE | 08.02.2022 | LU | 08.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NO | 12.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014226612 (KIM HYUNGTAE [KR], et al); | International search | [YA]US2014226612 (KIM HYUNGTAE [KR], et al); | [A]US2018006791 (MARINIER PAUL [CA], et al); |