EP3723659 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DENTAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redios-Tec GmbH Industriestr. 22 83395 Freilassing / DE | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Stephan Adalbert-Stifter-Str. 19 83278 Traunstein / DE | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 19752161.0 | 05.08.2019 | [2020/43] | WO2019EP71048 | Priority number, date | DE201810119078 | 06.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018119078 | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020030605 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3723659 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3723659 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/77, A61C13/00, A61C13/08, B33Y10/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
A61C13/08 (EP);
A61C13/081 (US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C13/34 (US);
A61C5/77 (EP,US);
B29C33/3835 (US);
B29C33/3892 (US);
B29C33/448 (US);
B29C33/48 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DENTALBAUTEILS | [2020/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DENTAL COMPONENT | [2020/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DENTAIRE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 14.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2019 | AL | 20.04.2022 | CY | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | ES | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | PL | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IE | 05.08.2022 | LU | 05.08.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 05.08.2019 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.08.2022 | ||
LU | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.08.2022 | ||
LU | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.08.2022 | ||
LU | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.08.2022 | ||
LU | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | CZ | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO0209612 (BRIEN DENTAL LAB INC O [US], et al); | [XA]US2002125619 (BODENMILLER ANTON [DE], et al); | [XA]US2014377718 (KORTEN MALTE [DE], et al) | Examination | EP2082703 | DE102016225208 |