EP3843999 - METHOD FOR SETTING THE LAYER THICKNESS OF A COVERING COATING MATERIAL TO BE APPLIED TO A SUBSTRATE BY AN APPLICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEMMING, Steven Römerweg 116 10318 Berlin / DE | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19752500.9 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019EP71451 | Priority number, date | DE201810121301 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018121301 | [2021/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043463 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843999 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3843999 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41J11/00, B05D1/28 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B41F33/0045 (EP,US);
B05D1/28 (EP,US);
B41F33/0027 (US);
B41J11/0015 (EP,US);
B05D2252/02 (EP,US);
B41P2233/11 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | B41F33/00, B05D1/00, B41J1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSTELLEN EINER SCHICHTDICKE EINES VON EINER AUFTRAGEINRICHTUNG AUF EIN SUBSTRAT AUFZUTRAGENDEN DECKENDEN BESCHICHTUNGSSTOFFES | [2021/27] | English: | METHOD FOR SETTING THE LAYER THICKNESS OF A COVERING COATING MATERIAL TO BE APPLIED TO A SUBSTRATE BY AN APPLICATION DEVICE | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'AJUSTER UNE DENSITÉ DE COUCHE D'UN MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT DEVANT ÊTRE APPLIQUÉ PAR UN DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION SUR UN SUBSTRAT DE MANIÈRE À LE RECOUVRIR | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 03.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | DK | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | ES | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | IT | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | NL | 24.08.2022 | PL | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/16] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 24.08.2022 | |
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 24.08.2022 | |
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3543444 (BRUNNER FELIX) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * pages 5-15, 25 * * page 30 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0272468 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * columns 1-5 * * figure 1 *; | [XI]DE3818405 (AUER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * abstract * * columns 1-6 * * figures 1-7 * [I] 3,4,9; | [A]DE3830121 (BRUNNER FELIX [CH]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * columns 1-2,4-7 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0490093 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * columns 1-5 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1275502 (ALCAN TECH & MAN AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0018] - [0025] - [0033] - [0044] - [0053] - [0055] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102012012517 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [0006] - [0010] - [0014] , [0016] , [0020] - [0023] * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE3226144 | DE3411836 | DE102007005018 | DE102007061397 | DE102014011151 | US2015090136 |