EP3833727 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR LUBRICATING AUTOMOTIVE GEARS, AXLES AND BEARINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092-2298 / US | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTON, William R.S. P.O. Box 88 Belper Derbyshire DE56 1QN / GB | 02 /
FILIPPINI, Brian B. 29400 Lakeland Blvd. Wickliffe, Ohio 44092-2298 / US | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/16] |
Former [2021/24] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19752868.0 | 01.08.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019US44660 | Priority number, date | US201862715041P | 06.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862715041 P | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020033232 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3833727 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3833727 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C10M137/00, C10M141/10, C10N30/06, C10N40/02, C10N40/04 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
C10M137/00 (EP);
C10M169/048 (CN);
C10M137/10 (US);
C10M135/36 (US);
C10M137/08 (US);
C10M141/10 (EP);
C10M169/04 (CN,US);
C10M2201/085 (CN);
C10M2205/0206 (CN);
C10M2209/084 (EP,CN);
C10M2209/1023 (CN);
C10M2219/022 (EP,CN);
C10M2219/106 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,CN);
C10M2223/043 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2223/047 (CN);
C10M2223/049 (CN);
C10N2010/14 (US);
C10N2020/02 (US);
C10N2030/04 (US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,CN,US);
C10N2030/10 (CN);
C10N2030/43 (US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2223/045, C10N2010/04 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHMIERUNG VON GETRIEBEN, ACHSEN UND LAGERN EINES FAHRZEUGES | [2021/24] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR LUBRICATING AUTOMOTIVE GEARS, AXLES AND BEARINGS | [2021/24] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE LUBRIFICATION D'ENGRENAGES, D'ESSIEUX ET DE PALIERS AUTOMOBILES | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 23.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP24170342.0 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0617117 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,17-21 * page 13, lines 53-57; example IX * [I] 3; | [X]JPH09132790 (COSMO SOGO KENKYUSHO KK, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-13,17,20,21 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0025] , [0026]; claim -; table 2 *; | [X]EP1057883 (ORONITE JAPAN LIMITED [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11,13,17-21 * paragraphs [0014] , [0042]; tables 1,2 *; | [X]US6503872 (TOMARO JOSEPH A [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10,12-14,17,20,21* example -; table - *; | [XI]EP1640440 (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,10,12-15,17,20,21 * paragraph [0030]; example -; claim -; table 1 * [I] 16; | [XI]EP2025739 (AFTON CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11,17,19-21 * example -; claim -; table 1 * [I] 14 | by applicant | US3087936 | US3197405 | US3254025 | US3544465 | WO2008094759 |