EP3753149 - SX PROTOCOL EXTENSION TO SUPPORT NODE PDR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Jiehong Eklanda Skog 64 431 49 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
JIMENEZ CORDON, Carlos C/Ladera de los Almendros 14 F 3 B 28032 Madrid / ES | 03 /
MUNOZ DE LA TORRE ALONSO, Miguel Angel Padre Claret 6, 8C ESC D 28002 Madrid / ES | 04 /
PUENTE PESTANA, Miguel Angel C/Granada 38-3i 28007 Madrid / ES | 05 /
SONG, Yumei Maj pa Maloes gata 21 417 67 Göteborg / SE | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19754241.8 | 15.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019CN75136 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN76914 | 15.02.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/076914 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019158116 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753149 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3753149 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04M15/00, H04W4/24 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
H04L12/1407 (EP);
H04W76/12 (US);
H04M15/66 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W88/16 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SX-PROTOKOLLERWEITERUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES KNOTEN-PDR | [2020/52] | English: | SX PROTOCOL EXTENSION TO SUPPORT NODE PDR | [2020/52] | French: | EXTENSION DE PROTOCOLE SX POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE PDR DE NOEUD | [2023/12] |
Former [2020/52] | EXTENSION DE PROTOCOLE SX POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE PDR DE N& X152;UD | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3487120 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1,8,17-20 * paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0152] * * paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] *; | [XDI] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Interface between the Control Plane and the User Plane Nodes; Stage 3 (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 29.244, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20171221), vol. CT WG4, no. V14.2.0, pages 1 - 156, XP051392054 [XD] 1,8,17-20 * paragraph [5.2.1] * * paragraph [06.3] * * paragraph [7.2.2.4.2] * * paragraph [7.5.3.2] * * paragraph [7.5.4.2] - paragraph [7.5.4.6] * [I] 2-7,9-13,16 | [A] - HUAWEI, "Update of the TS to prepare it for 5GC/N4", vol. CT WG4, no. Kochi, India; 20171023 - 20171027, (20171204), 3GPP DRAFT; 29244_CR0037R2_(REL-15)_C4-175385, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fct/TSG%5FCT/TSGC%5F78%5FLisbon/Docs/CP%2D173034%2Ezip, (20171204), XP051624228 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [A] - NOKIA et al., "Controlling the UP to buffer, drop or duplicate data packets", SA WG2 Meeting #117, S2-166176, (20161021), XP051154715 [A] 1-20 * , Section 7.1 * | [A] - HUAWEI, "Pseudo-CR on Removal of the Editor's Notes for Usage monitoring and charging", SA WG2 Meeting #117, C4-173265, (20170519), XP051284793 [A] 1-20 * , the whole document * | [A] - NOKIA et al., "Pseudo-CR on Removal of the Editor's Notes for Usage monitoring and charging", 3GPP TSG CT4 Meeting #76, C4-171268, (20170217), XP051236211 [A] 1-20 * , the whole document * | [A] - NEC, "Pseudo-CR on N4 requirement to deactivate UP connection when UPF detects that the PDU Session has no data activity", 3GPP TSG CT4 Meeting #81, C4-176077, (20171201), XP051368280 [A] 1-20 * , the whole document * | by applicant | EP3487120 |