EP3752606 - COMPOUNDS COMPRISING SHORT-CHAIN FATTY ACID MOIETIES AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carnot, LLC 20 Park Plaza Suite 1200 Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVIN, Andrew D. 38 Eldredge Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19754919.9 | 13.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019US17815 | Priority number, date | US201862710478P | 16.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862710478 P | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019160926 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3752606 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/40, A61K31/225, A61P1/00 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
C07C69/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/225 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | C12N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN MIT KURZKETTIGEN FETTSÄURERTEILEN SOWIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/52] | English: | COMPOUNDS COMPRISING SHORT-CHAIN FATTY ACID MOIETIES AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS THEREOF | [2020/52] | French: | COMPOSÉS COMPRENANT DES FRACTIONS D'ACIDES GRAS À CHAÎNE COURTE ET COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES ASSOCIÉES | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 24.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/45] | 20.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017147220 (CARNOT LLC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,9,11,12,14,15 * Abstract; page 82: compounds I-29, I-31; claims 1, 9, 13-14, 18. *; | [X]JP2010037467 (HAKUTO KK) [X] 1,2,4,6-15 * Pages 8-10 and 24-25: compounds (4) to (6). *; | [X] - Nemoto et al., "An efficient and practical method for the preparation of a branched oligoglycerol with acetonide protection groups", Reaxys, Elsevier Life Sciences IP Limited, (2010), Database accession no. 21545000 (XRN), XP055851697 [X] 1-6,9,12,15 * abstract * | [X] - Chemistry Letters 2010, 39, 856-857. [X] 1-6,9,12,15 | [X] - Cassel et al., "Original synthesis of linear, branched and cyclic oligoglycerol standards", Reaxys, Elsevier Life Sciences IP Limited, (2001), Database accession no. 8783611, 8796643, 8806733, 8806795 (XRN), XP055851705 [X] 1-6,9,12,15 * abstract * | [X] - European Journal of Organic Chemistry 2001, 5, 875-896. [X] 1-6,9,12,15 | [X] - MUKUGI, YASUO, "Diglyceryl ether plasticizers for lower fatty esters of cellulose, cellulose ester films containing them, and their manufacture", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2000), Database accession no. 2000:136321, URL: STN, XP055851785 [X] 1,2,4,7,10,13 * Abstract; RN 259546-43-5. * | [X] - KWAK, SEUNG-YEOP ET AL., "Hyper-branched polyether compound for polyvinyl chloride composition", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2013), Database accession no. 2013:1156562, URL: STN, XP055851791 [X] 1,3,5,8,11,14 * Abstract; RNs 1448250-14-3, 1448250-15-4. * | [X] - MEIDANI, JAVAD ET AL., "The identification of radiolytic decomposition products from tributyrin", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1978), Database accession no. 1978:33939, URL: STN, XP055851797 [X] 1,3,5,8,11,14 * Abstract; RN 65235-15-6. * | [A] - Van Der Beek et al., "Role of short-chain fatty acids in colonic inflammation, carcinogenesis, and mucosal protection and healing", Nutrition Reviews, doi:10.1093/nutrit/nuw067, (20170401), pages 286 - 305, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1111/j.1753-4887.1998.tb01654.x/asset/j.1753-4887.1998.tb01654.x.pdf?v=1&t=jetndpil&s=0eb47e3332cb958dcec2895342b97b83db9a32d9, XP055460057 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nutrit/nuw067 | International search | [X]WO2017147220 (CARNOT LLC [US]) [X] 1-5 * , entire document, especially: pg 80, formula I-22; pg 82, formula I-29. *; | [A]US7507859 (GRINSTAFF MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire document. *; | [A]US3989728 (MARTIN JAMES BRUCE) [A] 1-5 * , entire document. * |