EP3829350 - AEROSOL GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOUN, Walid Abi Globe House, 1 Water Street London greater London WC1R 3LA / GB | 02 /
LEAH, Thomas David c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19755547.7 | 31.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019EP70726 | Priority number, date | GB20180012502 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: GB 201812502 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020025728 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829350 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/02, A24F47/00 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24B3/14 (IL,KR,RU,US);
A24D1/20 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24B15/12 (IL,RU,US);
A24B15/14 (IL,KR,RU,US);
A24B15/16 (IL,KR,US);
A24B15/167 (IL,RU,US);
A24C5/005 (IL,US);
A24C5/01 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24D1/002 (IL,KR,RU,US);
A24D1/02 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24D1/025 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNG | [2021/23] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATION | [2021/23] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 16.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2003178039 (WHITE JACKIE LEE [US], et al); | [XA]WO2007036814 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]); | [XA]US2010200006 (ROBINSON JOHN HOWARD [US], et al); | [XAI]US2011168195 (OLIVEIRA PAULO [GB]); | [XA]GB2495925 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) | by applicant | WO2017EP68804 |