EP3850561 - DEVICE FOR FILING A COMPLAINT AGAINST AT LEAST ONE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telegärtner Elektronik GmbH Hofäckerstrasse 18 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUSKA, Dirk c/o Hofäckerstr.18 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19755886.9 | 15.08.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019EP71912 | Priority number, date | DE201810122291 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018122291 | [2021/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020052900 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850561 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ABWICKLUNG EINER REKLAMATION WENIGSTENS EINES GEGENSTANDS | [2021/29] | English: | DEVICE FOR FILING A COMPLAINT AGAINST AT LEAST ONE OBJECT | [2021/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE RÉCLAMATION D'AU MOINS UN OBJET | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 17.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2004084527 (BONG JUWONO W [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0079] ** paragraph [0131]; figures 1, 2A-2C, 3,4 * |