EP3830353 - A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR BUILDING A ROAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PR Licensing B.V. Lange Dreef 9 4131 NJ Vianen / NL | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Wavin B.V. Stationsplein 3 8011 CW Zwolle / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUDSTAAL, Anne Cornelis Pieter Liesveldweg 14 4233 HH Ameide / NL | 02 /
JORRITSMA, Simon Reling 57 3863 VA Nijkerk / NL | 03 /
BOSHOVE, Antonie Twan Dorpsstraat 8 7694 AC Kloosterhaar / NL | 04 /
JAGER, Harm Jantinus Marcel Hoofdweg 32A 7676 AG Westerhaar / NL | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | van Bouwelen, Franciscus Maria Hoffmann Eitle B.V. Weerdestein 97 1083 GG Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Ferro, Frodo Nunes Hoffmann Eitle B.V. Strawinskylaan 3051, 4th Floor 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 19755987.5 | 24.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019NL50476 | Priority number, date | NL20182021404 | 27.07.2018 Original published format: NL 2021404 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020022888 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830353 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E03F1/00, E01C3/00, E01C5/00, E01C11/22 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
E01C11/224 (EP,IL,KR);
E01C3/00 (EP,IL,KR);
E01C11/227 (US);
E01C5/001 (EP,IL,KR,US);
E01C5/20 (US);
E01C5/005 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BAUEN EINER STRASSE | [2021/23] | English: | A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR BUILDING A ROAD | [2021/23] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION D'UNE ROUTE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2002148186 (KASTEN DENIS W [US]); | [XI]DE102006031789 (STOLL JOHANN [DE]); | [A]FR2917384 (RAIN CUBE SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMP [FR]); | [XI]US2013152499 (KRIEKEMEIER JOHN E [US]); | [AD]WO2016042141 (WAVIN BV [NL]); | [A]US2018030712 (KENT ZACHARIHA J [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0042215 | EP1311727 | EP1469133 | DE102009044412 | EP2463449 | EP2980328 | WO2016042141 | EP3165687 | WO2018083346 | NL20181042777 | NL20181042809 | WO2019EP55375 | WO2019EP58382 |