EP3824304 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE OPERATING STATE OF A BATTERY AND BATTERY IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Electrical & Power Parc d'Activité Andromède 1 rue Louis Blériot CS 80049 31702 Blagnac Cedex / FR | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAYEGH, Marie Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19756425.5 | 16.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019FR51783 | Priority number, date | FR20180056603 | 17.07.2018 Original published format: FR 1856603 | [2021/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020016521 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824304 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3824304 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
G01R31/3647 (EP,US);
G01R31/374 (EP,US);
G01R31/008 (EP,US);
G01R31/392 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES BETRIEBSZUSTANDS EINER BATTERIE UND BATTERIE MIT IMPLEMENTIERUNG SOLCH EINES VERFAHRENS | [2021/21] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE OPERATING STATE OF A BATTERY AND BATTERY IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD | [2021/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'ÉTAT DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE BATTERIE ET BATTERIE METTANT EN OEUVRE UN TEL PROCÉDÉ | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 09.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4968942 (PALANISAMY THIRUMALAI G [US]); | [XI]WO2015101731 (RENAULT SA [FR]); | [A]US9157968 (TAYLOR GLEN [US], et al); | [A]US2015292958 (SCHNETKER TED R [US]) |