EP3702905 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Hyungtak 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KO, Hyeonmok 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jihie 103-501, 201, Seoun-ro Seocho-gu Seoul, 06608 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hongchul 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
HWANG, Inchul 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 19757983.2 | 02.01.2019 | [2020/36] | WO2019KR00036 | Priority number, date | KR20180021876 | 23.02.2018 Original published format: KR 20180021876 | [2020/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019164120 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702905 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G06F3/01, G06F3/00, G06F18/20 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP,KR,US);
G06F18/20 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/005 (KR,US);
G06F3/01 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (KR,US);
G06F3/16 (EP,US);
G06V40/171 (KR,US);
G10L17/18 (US);
G10L17/22 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | G06F3/16, G06F3/00, G06F3/01, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/36] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2020/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2020 | Translation filed | 27.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 07.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20140039868 (KUM YOUNG CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20140068752 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [YA]US9098467 (BLANKSTEEN SCOTT IAN [US], et al); | [Y]KR20160065671 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US9424840 (HART GREGORY MICHAEL [US], et al) |