EP3841027 - FOOD STORAGE TRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Alicia Stress Engineering Services Inc. 13800 Westfair East Drive Houston, Texas 77041 / US | 02 /
HARRELL, Patrick Stress Engineering Services Inc. 13800 Westfair East Drive Houston, Texas 77041 / US | 03 /
KULKARNI, Mandar Madhukar Stress Engineering Services Inc. 13800 Westfair East Drive Houston, Texas 77041 / US | 04 /
QUINONES, Rafael 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, New Jersey 07936 / US | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19758579.7 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019US45848 | Priority number, date | US201862720801P | 21.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862720801 P | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020041008 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841027 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3841027 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/36, B65D5/50, B65D85/36 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
B65D1/36 (EP,US);
B65D5/503 (EP,US);
B65D85/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEBENSMITTELAUFBEWAHRUNGSBEHÄLTER | [2021/26] | English: | FOOD STORAGE TRAY | [2021/26] | French: | PLATEAU DE STOCKAGE D'ALIMENTS | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 09.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23187059.3 / EP4253264 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 09.08.2023 | LU | 09.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 09.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 09.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3740238 (GRAHAM S); | [A]US4568017 (GRUNERT BERND G [CA]); | [A]BE1018227 (LION PRODUCTS NV [BE]); | [A]US10011415 (BERGERON MARK A [US], et al) |