EP3836869 - DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING AT LEAST ONE ARM OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ottobock SE & Co. KGaA Max-Näder-Strasse 15 37115 Duderstadt / DE | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/08] | For all designated states Ottobock SE & Co. KGaA Frankfurter Strasse 3C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Ottobock SE & Co. KGaA Max-Näder-Strasse 15 37115 Duderstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPP, Emese Königsbrücker Str. 56 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [2023/24] |
Former [2021/25] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Straße 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 19758615.9 | 29.07.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019EP70344 | Priority number, date | DE201810119754 | 14.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018119754 | [2021/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035298 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836869 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3836869 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3836869 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01, B25J9/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
A61F5/013 (EP);
B25J9/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM UNTERSTÜTZEN WENIGSTENS EINES ARMES EINES BENUTZERS | [2021/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING AT LEAST ONE ARM OF A USER | [2021/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À SOUTENIR AU MOINS UN BRAS D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 12.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | LU | 29.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 29.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 29.07.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 29.07.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]JP2009106270 (INST NAT COLLEGES TECH JAPAN, et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document * * figure 5 *; | [ID]US2014158839 (DOYLE MARK C [US]) [ID] 1-10 * figures 2, 6A,10A, 10B, 11A, 11B * * paragraphs [0088] , [0109] , [ 110] *; | [ID]US2016339583 (VAN ENGELHOVEN LOGAN [US], et al) [ID] 1-10 * figures 3, 13 * * paragraphs [0073] , [0 80] , [0 81] *; | [A]DE102016121203 (BOCK HEALTHCARE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,3 ** paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] , [0019] - [0022] * | by applicant | JP2009106270 | US2014158839 | WO2014093408 | WO2014195373 | US2016081871 | US9427865 | US2016339583 | DE102017112436 |