EP3807757 - METHOD FOR ACCELERATING THE EXECUTION OF A SINGLE-PATH PROGRAM BY THE PARALLEL EXECUTION OF CONDITIONALLY CONCURRENT SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAN, Mathieu 34, Rue de Picpus 75012 PARIS / FR | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19758795.9 | 15.07.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019FR51768 | Priority number, date | FR20180056659 | 18.07.2018 Original published format: FR 1856659 | [2021/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020016511 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807757 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/28 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
G06F9/28 (EP,US);
G06F9/3851 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHLEUNIGUNG DER AUSFÜHRUNG EINES EINZELPFADPROGRAMMS DURCH PARALLELE AUSFÜHRUNG VON BEDINGT KONKURRIERENDEN SEQUENZEN | [2021/16] | English: | METHOD FOR ACCELERATING THE EXECUTION OF A SINGLE-PATH PROGRAM BY THE PARALLEL EXECUTION OF CONDITIONALLY CONCURRENT SEQUENCES | [2021/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÉLERATION DE L'EXÉCUTION D'UN PROGRAMME À CHEMIN UNIQUE PAR EXÉCUTION EN PARALLÈLE DE SÉQUENCES CONDITIONNELLEMENT CONCURRENTES | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 12.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/24] | 15.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014215187 (YAZDANI REZA [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11 * figures 2, 9 * * abstract * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0050] * [I] 3-5,7,10; | [A]US2016196112 (EDWARDS DAVID ALAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document * |